This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:51:07 (UTC).

Barclays Bank Delaware vs Socorro A Mendoza

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Barclays Bank Delaware filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Socorro A Mendoza. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1958

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barclays Bank Delaware

Defendant

Mendoza, Socorro A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kennard, Robert Scott

 

Court Documents

notice of settlement

Notice of Settlement - Conditional filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Notice of Settlement - Conditional; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 08/01/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 42. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Socorro A Mendoza served on 08/26/2016 by Substituted Service. $40.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Declaration

Declaration of non service filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Barclays Bank Delaware, Socorro A Mendoza Entered. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Declaration of non service

Declaration of Non Service as to Socorro A. Mendoza filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2017
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Barclays Bank Delaware, Socorro A Mendoza Entered. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Request for Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 08/01/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 42. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Case status updated to Conditional Settlement. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement - Conditional filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Notice of Settlement - Conditional; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • First paper Limited Civil (amounts up to $10,000) filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Pntf paid Deft. fees Action Type: First paper Limited Civil (amounts up to $10,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Payment received by Barclays Bank Delaware in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 122140. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Socorro A Mendoza served on 08/26/2016 by Substituted Service. $40.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of non service filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Non Service as to Socorro A. Mendoza filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 35034. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Robert Scott Kennard, retained for Barclays Bank Delaware . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less