This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:52:13 (UTC).

Barclays Bank Delaware vs Ramon Glasgow

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Barclays Bank Delaware filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Ramon Glasgow. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1971

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barclays Bank Delaware

Defendant

Glasgow, Ramon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kennard, Robert Scott

 

Court Documents

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

EJ100 Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. - FULL Action Type: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $0.00 filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

Declaration

Declaration filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Ramon Glasgow served on 03/26/2016. Type of Service Personal. $69.50. Judge: Holly, Carter.

JUD100 Judgment

Judgment for Barclays Bank Delaware against Ramon Glasgow in the amount of $2187.41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Writ Return

Writ of Execution as to Ramon Glasgow returned and filed. Status: Returned Without Satisfaction. Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Ramon Glasgow Entered Judge: Holly, Carter.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution as to Ramon Glasgow returned and filed. Status: Returned Without Satisfaction. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. - FULL Action Type: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Writ of Execution issued as to Ramon Glasgow on 10/20/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Payment received by Barclays Bank Delaware in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 112418. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $0.00 filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • Payment received by Law Office of Nelson & Kennard in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 91486. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for Barclays Bank Delaware against Ramon Glasgow in the amount of $2187.41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Ramon Glasgow Entered Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Ramon Glasgow served on 03/26/2016. Type of Service Personal. $69.50. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 35111. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Barclays Bank Delaware. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Robert Scott Kennard, retained for Barclays Bank Delaware . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less