This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 04/17/2022 at 03:40:43 (UTC).

Barbara Quipp vs PAQ, Inc. d/b/a Rancho San Miguel

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 Barbara Quipp filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PAQ, Inc d/b/a Rancho San Miguel. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kronlund, Barbara and Waters, Robert T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************8822

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kronlund, Barbara

Waters, Robert T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Quipp, Barbara

Defendant

PAQ, Inc. d/b/a Rancho San Miguel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gundlach, Thomas J

Defendant Attorney

Kronlund, Michael C

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Quipp, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Quipp, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Answer

Answer to Complaint filed by PAQ, Inc. d/b/a Rancho San Miguel.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte held on 10/18/2021 08:45 AM .

#170.3

Disqualification of Judge Under CCP 170.3 and Notice of Judicial Reassignment

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer (RW)

Robert T. Waters Assigned.

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer (RW)

Robert T. Waters Assigned.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to PAQ, Inc. d/b/a Rancho San Miguel served on 09/23/2021 by Substituted Service. $0.00.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Quipp, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by PAQ, Inc. d/b/a Rancho San Miguel.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 03/17/2022 08:30 AM .

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Mandatory Settlement Conference , set for 08/14/2023 at 2:30 PM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.

Notice of Hearing - Civil Jury Trial

Hearing regarding: Jury Trial Assignment (est. 7 days), set for 09/18/2023 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Jury Trial; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participants; Barbara Quipp (Plaintiff); PAQ, Inc. d/b/a Rancho San Miguel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participants; Barbara Quipp (Plaintiff); PAQ, Inc. d/b/a Rancho San Miguel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Result: Reassigned; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participants; Barbara Quipp (Plaintiff); PAQ, Inc. d/b/a Rancho San Miguel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Result: Held; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participants; Barbara Quipp (Plaintiff); PAQ, Inc. d/b/a Rancho San Miguel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing regarding: Jury Trial Assignment (est. 7 days), set for 09/18/2023 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing regarding: Mandatory Settlement Conference , set for 08/14/2023 at 2:30 PM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 03/17/2022 08:30 AM .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on March 17, 2022.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by PAQ, Inc. d/b/a Rancho San Miguel.; Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Barbara Quipp in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 719672.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint filed by PAQ, Inc. d/b/a Rancho San Miguel.; Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Inc. PAQ in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 689103.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 03/17/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Quipp, Barbara.; Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Quipp, Barbara.; Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Thomas J Gundlach, retained for Barbara Quipp .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Thomas Gundlach in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 680751.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Paq, Inc. dba Food 4 Less and/or Rancho San Miguel Markets, a California Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kronlund, Michael C