This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 01/19/2020 at 14:25:33 (UTC).

Bar Company Sales, INC. dba The Creamery Business Park vs Carlos Enrique Castaneda, individually and dba Castmont Conrete Cutting et al.

Case Summary

On 08/06/2019 Bar Company Sales, INC dba The Creamery Business Park filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against Carlos Enrique Castaneda, individually and dba Castmont Conrete Cutting. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fattarsi, Jonathan W.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0188

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manteca Branch Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fattarsi, Jonathan W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bar Company Sales, INC. dba The Creamery Business Park

Defendants

Barajas, individually and dba Castmont Concrete Cutting, Feranand

Castaneda, individually and dba Castmont Conrete Cutting, Carlos Enrique

Castaneda, individually and dba Castmont Concrete Cutting, Carlos Enrique

Barajas, individually and dba Castmont Concrete Cutting, Fernando

Carlos Enrique Castaneda individually and dba Castmont Concrete Cutting,

Fernando Barajas individually and dba Castmont Concrete Cutting,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bronson, Martha

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Fernando Barajas individually and dba Castmont Concrete Cutting without prejudice. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Bar Company Sales, INC. dba The Creamery Business Park. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bar Company Sales, INC. dba The Creamery Business Park. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Bar Company Sales, INC. dba The Creamery Business Park. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

Judgment

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Bar Company Sales, INC. dba The Creamery Business Park against Carlos Enrique Castaneda individually and dba Castmont Concrete Cutting filed and entered Judgment does not apply to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Bar Company Sales, INC. dba The Creamery Business Park NOT ENTERED. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Carlos Enrique Castaneda individually and dba Castmont Concrete Cutting served on 09/10/2019 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. . Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

Notice to Filing Party

Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Bar Company Sales, INC. dba The Creamery Business Park NOT ENTERED. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

UnlawfulDetainerNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Carlos Enrique Castaneda, individually and dba Castmont Concrete Cutting served on 08/08/2019 by . $0.00. INVALID. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Carlos Enrique Castaneda, individually and dba Castmont Concrete Cutting Entered Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

AMENDED Proof of Personal Service as to Carlos Enrique Castaneda individually and dba Castmont Concrete Cutting filed by Bar Company Sales, INC. dba The Creamery Business Park. Action Type: Proof of Personal Service; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession as to Carlos Enrique Castaneda individually and dba Castmont Concrete Cutting served on 09/10/2019 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. . Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued as to Carlos Enrique Castaneda individually and dba Castmont Concrete Cutting on 08/20/2019 to . Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Bronson in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 460919. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Bar Company Sales, INC. dba The Creamery Business Park against Carlos Enrique Castaneda individually and dba Castmont Concrete Cutting filed and entered Judgment does not apply to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Participant entered as to Fernando Barajas individually and dba Castmont Concrete Cutting without prejudice. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Bar Company Sales, INC. dba The Creamery Business Park. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed by Bar Company Sales, INC. dba The Creamery Business Park. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default against Carlos Enrique Castaneda, individually and dba Castmont Concrete Cutting Entered Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Bar Company Sales, INC. dba The Creamery Business Park. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Bar Company Sales, INC. dba The Creamery Business Park NOT ENTERED. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Carlos Enrique Castaneda, individually and dba Castmont Concrete Cutting served on 08/08/2019 by . $0.00. INVALID. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Bar Company Sales, INC. dba The Creamery Business Park. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bar Company Sales, INC. dba The Creamery Business Park. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Martha Bronson in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 454996. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Martha Bronson, retained for Bar Company Sales, INC. dba The Creamery Business Park . Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Fattarsi, Jonathan W..

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.