This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/18/2018 at 02:47:09 (UTC).

Bank of Stockton vs Melissa A James

Case Summary

On 09/06/2017 Bank of Stockton filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Melissa A James. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************9335

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank of Stockton

Defendant

James, Melissa A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ross, David Keith

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bank of Stockton. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Bank of Stockton. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Melissa A James served on 10/13/2017 by Substituted Service. $195.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Amended Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Amended Complaint

First Amended Complaint filed by Bank of Stockton. Action Type: Amended Complaint; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Bank of Stockton. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 03/05/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Melissa A James served on 06/06/2018 by Personal Service. $0.00. on first amended complaint**POS does not specify as to amended complaint** Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Bank of Stockton. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Personal Service of Complaint and summons filed by Bank of Stockton. (it is NOT for Amended Complaint) Action Type: Proof of Personal Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Melissa A James Not Entered Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default against Melissa A James Not Entered Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed by Bank of Stockton. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service of Complaint and summons filed by Bank of Stockton. (it is NOT for Amended Complaint) Action Type: Proof of Personal Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Bank of Stockton. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Melissa A James served on 06/06/2018 by Personal Service. $0.00. on first amended complaint**POS does not specify as to amended complaint** Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 07/24/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on March 5, 2018. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 03/05/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Bank of Stockton. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint filed by Bank of Stockton. Action Type: Amended Complaint; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Melissa A James served on 10/13/2017 by Substituted Service. $195.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 03/05/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketAttorney, David Keith Ross, retained for Bank of Stockton . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bank of Stockton. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Bank of Stockton. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketPayment received by Bank of Stockton in the amount of $370.00. Receipt number 206201. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSS, DAVID K