This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/17/2018 at 22:26:30 (UTC).

Bank Of Stockton vs Maria G Hernandez/Camacho

Case Summary

On 06/29/2017 Bank Of Stockton filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Maria G Hernandez/Camacho. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lofthus, Linda L. and Scott, W. Stephen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************6707

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lofthus, Linda L.

Scott, W. Stephen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank Of Stockton

Defendant

Maria G Hernandez/Camacho also known as Maria G Hernandez,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ross, David Keith

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Complaint

Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Bank Of Stockton. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bank Of Stockton. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer

12/07/2017: Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Bank Of Stockton. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 12/29/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Bank Of Stockton. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Proof of Service/ Publication held on 03/29/2018 08:30 AM . Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Maria G Hernandez/Camacho also known as Maria G Hernandez served on 02/20/2018 by Substituted Service. $245.00. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Maria G Hernandez/Camacho also known as Maria G Hernandez Entered Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Does 1-20 filed by Bank Of Stockton. Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Bank Of Stockton. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

JUD100 Judgment

Judgment for Bank Of Stockton against Maria G Hernandez/Camacho also known as Maria G Hernandez in the amount of 14688.18. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

EJ125 Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination filed by Bank Of Stockton. Action Type: Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination filed by Bank Of Stockton. Action Type: Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketPayment received by David Ross in the amount of $60.00. Receipt number 309011. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketHearing regarding: Appearance and Examination of Judgment , set for 09/05/2018 at 9:00 AM before Hon. W. Stephen Scott in Department 10A. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment Issued. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketPayment received by Bank Of Stockton in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 296206. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment for Bank Of Stockton against Maria G Hernandez/Camacho also known as Maria G Hernandez in the amount of 14688.18. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default against Maria G Hernandez/Camacho also known as Maria G Hernandez Entered Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Bank Of Stockton. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/26/2017
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 12/29/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Bank Of Stockton. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 12/29/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Linda L. Lofthus in Department 10A. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketAttorney, David Keith Ross, retained for Bank Of Stockton . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • DocketPayment received by Bank Of Stockton in the amount of $370.00. Receipt number 184710. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bank Of Stockton. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Bank Of Stockton. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSS, DAVID K