This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/17/2018 at 19:32:01 (UTC).

Bank of Stockton vs Gregg L Betz et al.

Case Summary

On 05/17/2017 Bank of Stockton filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Gregg L Betz. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************4975

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank of Stockton

Defendants

Gregg L. Betz, individually,

Gregg L Betz dba Stockton Moto Cycle Shop

Gregg L. Betz dba The Mile

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ross, David Keith

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

05/17/2017: Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Gregg L Betz dba Stockton Moto Cycle Shop served on 11/13/2017 by Substituted Service. $52.25. Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Gregg L Betz dba Stockton Moto Cycle Shop Not Entered Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Gregg L. Betz, individually, Gregg L. Betz dba The Mile Entered Judge: Holly, Carter.

Non Service Report

Declaration of Non Service as Gregg L. Betz Doing Business as Stockton Moto Cycle Shop filed by Bank of Stockton. Action Type: Declaration of Non Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 05/14/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Bank of Stockton. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Gregg L. Betz dba The Mile served on 11/13/2017 by Substituted Service. $72.25. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Bank of Stockton. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Proof of Service as to Gregg L. Betz doing business as The Mile filed by Bank of Stockton. Action Type: Amended; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Proof of Service as to Gregg L. Betz doing business as Stockton Moto Cycle Shop filed by Bank of Stockton. **Invalid Proof. Party not served as sued, #6 incorrect** Action Type: Amended; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 08/13/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 05/14/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketHearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on May 14, 2018. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default against Gregg L Betz dba Stockton Moto Cycle Shop Not Entered Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default against Gregg L. Betz, individually, Gregg L. Betz dba The Mile Entered Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Bank of Stockton. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Bank of Stockton. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Gregg L. Betz, individually served on 11/13/2017 by Substituted Service. $62.25. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non Service as Gregg L. Betz Doing Business as Stockton Moto Cycle Shop filed by Bank of Stockton. Action Type: Declaration of Non Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non Service as to Gregg L. Betz Doing Business as The Mile filed by Bank of Stockton. Action Type: Declaration of Non Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 11/14/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • DocketAttorney, David Keith Ross, retained for Bank of Stockton . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Bank of Stockton. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bank of Stockton. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • DocketPayment received by Bank of Stockton in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 169596. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSS, DAVID K