This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/17/2018 at 22:47:06 (UTC).

Bank of Stockton vs Frank L. Anderson et al.

Case Summary

On 07/06/2017 Bank of Stockton filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Frank L Anderson. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************6935

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank of Stockton

Defendants

Frank L. Anderson DBA Born Again Painting

Anderson, Frank L.

Anderson, Pamela A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ross, David Keith

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bank of Stockton. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Bank of Stockton. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM180 Notice of Stay of Proceedings

Notice of Stay of Proceedings - Case filed by Bank of Stockton. Action Type: Notice of Stay of Proceedings - Case; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Bank of Stockton. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Pamela A. Anderson served on 07/26/2017 by Personal Service. $55.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Frank L. Anderson served on 07/28/2017 by Substituted Service. $65.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Frank L. Anderson DBA Born Again Painting served on 07/28/2017 by Substituted Service. $45.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Frank L. Anderson DBA Born Again Painting served on 07/28/2017 by Substituted Service. $45.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Frank L. Anderson served on 07/28/2017 by Substituted Service. $65.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Pamela A. Anderson served on 07/26/2017 by Personal Service. $55.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Bank of Stockton. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings - Case filed by Bank of Stockton. Action Type: Notice of Stay of Proceedings - Case; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 01/02/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketAttorney, David Keith Ross, retained for Bank of Stockton . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketPayment received by Bank of Stockton in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 187197. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Bank of Stockton. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bank of Stockton. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSS, DAVID K