This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/25/2023 at 17:00:12 (UTC).

Bank of America, N.A. vs Raymond Danny Benavidez

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 Bank of America, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Raymond Danny Benavidez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0558

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank Of America, N.A.

Defendant

Benavidez, Raymond Danny

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wachtman, Jeremy

 

Court Documents

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Bank Of America, N.A..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bank Of America, N.A..

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons as to Raymond Danny Benavidez served on 02/17/2023 by Substituted Service. $77.00.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Raymond Danny Benavidez Entered

MC030 Declaration

Declaration filed by Bank of America, N.A..

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Does filed by Bank of America, N.A..

Statement

Statement of Account filed by Bank of America, N.A..

JUD100 Judgment

Judgment for Bank of America, N.A. against Raymond Danny Benavidez in the amount of 4961.80.

 

Docket Entries

08/14/2023

DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketJudgment for Bank of America, N.A. against Raymond Danny Benavidez in the amount of 4961.80.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal Does filed by Bank of America, N.A..; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatement of Account filed by Bank of America, N.A..; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration filed by Bank of America, N.A..; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Default against Raymond Danny Benavidez Entered; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023

DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Default Clerk's Judgment filed by Bank Of America, N.A..; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Raymond Danny Benavidez served on 02/17/2023 by Substituted Service. $77.00.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Bank Of America, N.A..; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bank Of America, N.A..; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketPayment received by N.A. Bank Of America in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 806201.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketAttorney, Jeremy Wachtman, retained for Bank Of America, N.A. .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Case Assignment.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less