This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 05/06/2023 at 03:06:41 (UTC).

Azif Abdulsalakolisambeevi vs General Motors, LLC., a Delaware Limited liability Company et al.

Case Summary

On 11/09/2022 Azif Abdulsalakolisambeevi filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against General Motors, LLC , a Delaware Limited liability Company. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0377

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Court Documents

cm-010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Abdulsalakolisambeevi, Azif.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Abdulsalakolisambeevi, Azif.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to General Motors, LLC., a Delaware Limited liability Company served on 12/09/2022 by Personal Service $164.30 .

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to General Motors, LLC., a Delaware Limited liability Company served on 12/09/2022 by Personal Service $164.30 . Duplicate Filing.

Proof of Personal Service_346721.pdf

12/20/2022: Proof of Personal Service_346721.pdf

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal filed by Abdulsalakolisambeevi, Azif.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Azif Abdulsalakolisambeevi, General Motors, LLC., a Delaware Limited liability Company, DGDG 4 LLC, a California Limited Liability Company dba Capitol Chevrolet Entered.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Vacated; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participants; Azif Abdulsalakolisambeevi (Plaintiff); DGDG 4 LLC, a California Limited Liability Company dba Capitol Chevrolet (Defendant); General Motors, LLC., a Delaware Limited liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Azif Abdulsalakolisambeevi, General Motors, LLC., a Delaware Limited liability Company, DGDG 4 LLC, a California Limited Liability Company dba Capitol Chevrolet Entered.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed by Abdulsalakolisambeevi, Azif.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to General Motors, LLC., a Delaware Limited liability Company served on 12/09/2022 by Personal Service $164.30 .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to General Motors, LLC., a Delaware Limited liability Company served on 12/09/2022 by Personal Service $164.30 . Duplicate Filing.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 05/09/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Abdulsalakolisambeevi, Azif.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Abdulsalakolisambeevi, Azif.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Azif Abdulsalakolisambeevi in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 787252.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Adam M. Zolonz, retained for Azif Abdulsalakolisambeevi .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less