This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 06/13/2023 at 14:14:22 (UTC).

Avtar Kler vs Gustavo Garcia

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 Avtar Kler filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Gustavo Garcia. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mardini, Tameem. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************0172

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mardini, Tameem

 

Court Documents

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000 filed by Kler, Avtar.

Notice to Filing Party

01/12/2023: Notice to Filing Party

Declaration

Declaration of Due Diligence filed by Kler, Avtar.

Reset

Hearing regarding: Court Trial principle: 5500.00 costs 75.00, set for 06/05/2023 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Tameem Mardini in Department 3A.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 02/27/2023 01:30 PM .

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 06/05/2023 01:30 PM .

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Small Claims Judgment entered and filed.

 

Docket Entries

06/05/2023

HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: 3A; Result: Held; Judge: Tameem Mardini; Participants; Avtar Kler (Plaintiff); Gustavo Garcia (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Mardini, Tameem

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketHearing re: Court Trial held on June 5, 2023.; Judge: Mardini, Tameem

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSmall Claims Judgment entered and filed.; Judge: Mardini, Tameem

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMinutes finalized for Court Trial held on 06/05/2023 01:30 PM .; Judge: Mardini, Tameem

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2023

HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: 3A; Result: Vacated; Judge: Tameem Mardini; Participants; Avtar Kler (Plaintiff); Gustavo Garcia (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2023

HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: 3B; Result: Dropped; Judge: Katy E. Jacot; Participants; Avtar Kler (Plaintiff); Gustavo Garcia (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketHearing regarding: Court Trial principle: 5500.00 costs 75.00, set for 06/05/2023 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Tameem Mardini in Department 3A.; Judge: Mardini, Tameem

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2023

DocketHearing Result: Vacated; Judge: Mardini, Tameem

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2023

DocketHearing regarding: Court Trial principle: 5500.00 costs 75.00, set for 05/10/2023 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Tameem Mardini in Department 3A.; Judge: Mardini, Tameem

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMinutes finalized for Court Trial held on 02/27/2023 01:30 PM .; Judge: Jacot, Katy E.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2023

DocketHearing Result: Dropped; Judge: Jacot, Katy E.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence filed by Kler, Avtar.; Judge: Mardini, Tameem

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketHearing regarding: Court Trial principle 5500.00 costs 75.00, set for 02/27/2023 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Katy E. Jacot in Department 3B.; Judge: Jacot, Katy E.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000 filed by Kler, Avtar.; Judge: Mardini, Tameem

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketPayment received by Avtar Kler in the amount of $75.00. Receipt number 802662.; Judge: Mardini, Tameem

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Mardini, Tameem

[+] Read More [-] Read Less