This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 11:15:11 (UTC).

Augustin Pablo Gomez vs BWC Weststeyn Dairy LP et al.

Case Summary

On 04/28/2016 Augustin Pablo Gomez filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BWC Weststeyn Dairy LP. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************4128

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gomez, Augustin Pablo

Defendants

BWC Weststeyn Dairy LP

Eimbertus J. Weststeyn, in his capacity and as Trustee of the Weststeyn Revocable Living Trust

Weststeyn Dairy 2, a business organization form unknown

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hill, John E.

Defendant Attorneys

Kuykendall, Dale R.

Raimondo, Anthony Peter

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause (CCP 177.5)

Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Dismissal , set for 05/31/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation & Order Approving Settlement of Private Attorney General Act (PAGA) Penalties Sought as Part of Individual Settlement Agreement entered and filed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

MC050 Substitution of Attorney Civil (Without Court Order)

Substitution of Attorney filed by BWC Weststeyn Dairy LP. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 10/21/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by BWC Weststeyn Dairy LP., et al Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Weststeyn Dairy 2, a business organization form unknown served on 05/04/2016 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Gomez, Augustin Pablo. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal With Prejudice- Entire Action as to Augustin Pablo Gomez, BWC Weststeyn Dairy LP, Weststeyn Dairy 2, a business organization form unknown, Eimbertus J. Weststeyn, in his capacity and as Trustee of the Weststeyn Revocable Living Trust Granted. Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 05/02/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Gomez, Augustin Pablo. **All Causes of Action as to Plaintiff Pablo Gomez. No Class or PAGA Claims dismissed as to other Individuals.** Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 02/09/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Gomez, Augustin Pablo. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Answer

First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Eimbertus J. Weststeyn, in his capacity and as Trustee of the Weststeyn Revocable Living Trust; BWC Weststeyn Dairy LP; Weststeyn Dairy 2, a business organization form unknown. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to BWC Weststeyn Dairy LP served on 05/04/2016. Type of Service Personal. $133.85. Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Eimbertus J. Weststeyn, in his capacity and as Trustee of the Weststeyn Revocable Living Trust served on 05/04/2016 by Personal Service. $93.90. Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gomez, Augustin Pablo. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal With Prejudice- Entire Action as to Augustin Pablo Gomez, BWC Weststeyn Dairy LP, Weststeyn Dairy 2, a business organization form unknown, Eimbertus J. Weststeyn, in his capacity and as Trustee of the Weststeyn Revocable Living Trust Granted. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • Request for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Gomez, Augustin Pablo. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Court's OSC Re: Dismissal , set for 05/31/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 05/02/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on May 2, 2017. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Gomez, Augustin Pablo. **All Causes of Action as to Plaintiff Pablo Gomez. No Class or PAGA Claims dismissed as to other Individuals.** Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation & Order Approving Settlement of Private Attorney General Act (PAGA) Penalties Sought as Part of Individual Settlement Agreement entered and filed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • Payment received by Augustin Gomez in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 142566. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 10/21/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $1435.00. Receipt number 55266. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • Complex Case Fee (One fee for all Plaintffs) filed by Gomez, Augustin Pablo. Action Type: Complex Case Fee (One fee for all Plaintffs); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $1435.00. Receipt number 55266. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Gomez, Augustin Pablo. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gomez, Augustin Pablo. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • Attorney, John E. Hill, retained for Augustin Pablo Gomez . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less