This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 01/12/2023 at 21:30:24 (UTC).

Audra L. Fillion-Albert vs Erika Lynn St Andre

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 Audra L Fillion-Albert filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Erika Lynn St Andre. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Agbayani, Tony J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0946

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Agbayani, Tony J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Fillion-Albert, Audra L.

Respondent

St Andre, Erika Lynn

 

Court Documents

CivilRestrainingOrderNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Civil Restraining Order Notice to Filing Party.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Fillion-Albert, Audra L..

CH100 Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders

Request for Orders to Stop Harassment with Violence (Civil Harassment) filed by Fillion-Albert, Audra L..

CH110 MP Temporary Restraining Order

Temporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 02/08/2022.

CH109 Notice of Court Hearing (Civil Harassment Prevention)

Notice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Audra L. Fillion-Albert.

CH200 MP Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Sheriff (Fee Waived) as to Erika Lynn St Andre served on 02/15/2022 by Personal Service. $0.00.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 02/25/2022 10:30 AM .

CH130 MP Civil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing

The Court Orders the Restraining Order After Hearing to Stop Harassment (CLETS) (Civil Harassment) Granted on 02/25/2022. See Order filed herein.

 

Docket Entries

02/25/2022

HearingHearing Type: OSC Re: Harassment; Court Room: M2; Result: Held; Judge: Tony J. Agbayani

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2022

DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2022
View Court Documents

DocketThe Court Orders the Restraining Order After Hearing to Stop Harassment (CLETS) (Civil Harassment) Granted on 02/25/2022. See Order filed herein.; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMinutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 02/25/2022 10:30 AM .; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2022

DocketHearing re: OSC Re: Harassment held on February 25, 2022.; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service by Sheriff (Fee Waived) as to Erika Lynn St Andre served on 02/15/2022 by Personal Service. $0.00.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2022

DocketHearing regarding: OSC Re: Harassment , set for 02/25/2022 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Tony J. Agbayani in Department M2.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Audra L. Fillion-Albert.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketTemporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 02/08/2022.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Restraining Order Notice to Filing Party.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2022

DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Orders to Stop Harassment with Violence (Civil Harassment) filed by Fillion-Albert, Audra L..; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Fillion-Albert, Audra L..; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less