This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:54:14 (UTC).

Asset Capital Recovery Group, LLC vs Juan Antonio Sarabia

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Asset Capital Recovery Group, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Juan Antonio Sarabia. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lofthus, Linda L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1995

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lofthus, Linda L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Asset Capital Recovery Group, LLC

Asset Capital Recovery Group, LLC, a Limited Liability Company

Defendant

Sarabia, Juan Antonio

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenosian, John P

 

Court Documents

Declaration in Support

Declaration in Support Of Assignment Of Account filed by Asset Capital Recovery Group, LLC. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Complaint

Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Asset Capital Recovery Group, LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order filed by Asset Capital Recovery Group, LLC, a Limited Liability Company. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Judgment; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for dismissal. Does 1 to 5 inclusive only. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Asset Capital Recovery Group, LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Declaration in Support

Declaration in Support of Judgment filed by Asset Capital Recovery Group, LLC. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

JUD100 Judgment

Judgment for Asset Capital Recovery Group, LLC against Juan Antonio Sarabia aka Juan Antonio Sarabia Sr. aka Juan Sarabia in the amount of $3611.55. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Juan Antonio Sarabia served on 06/25/2016 by Substituted Service. $60.00. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fee Pursuant to BP 6322.1

Declaration in Support of Red in uced Filing Fee (Bus & Prof. Code 6322.1) filed by Asset Capital Recovery Group, LLC. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Writ Return

Writ of Execution as to Juan Antonio Sarabia returned and filed. Status: Returned With Full Satisfaction. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Declaration

Declaration Pursuant to CCP. 1033 filed by Asset Capital Recovery Group, LLC. Action Type: Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

Declaration in Support

Original Creditor's Declaration In Support Of Entry Of Default Judgment filed by Asset Capital Recovery Group, LLC. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

EJ100 Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment filed by Asset Capital Recovery Group, LLC, a Limited Liability Company. Action Type: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Asset Capital Recovery Group, LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment filed by Asset Capital Recovery Group, LLC, a Limited Liability Company. Action Type: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution as to Juan Antonio Sarabia returned and filed. Status: Returned With Full Satisfaction. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Payment received by LLC, Asset Capital Recovery Group in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 158281. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Writ of Execution issued as to Juan Antonio Sarabia on 01/20/2017 to Alameda County. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Payment received by LLC, Asset Capital Recovery Group in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 135799. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order filed by Asset Capital Recovery Group, LLC, a Limited Liability Company. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Judgment; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for Asset Capital Recovery Group, LLC against Juan Antonio Sarabia aka Juan Antonio Sarabia Sr. aka Juan Sarabia in the amount of $3611.55. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for dismissal. Does 1 to 5 inclusive only. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Asset Capital Recovery Group, LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Juan Antonio Sarabia served on 06/25/2016 by Substituted Service. $60.00. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Asset Capital Recovery Group, LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $181.00. Receipt number 35291. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Asset Capital Recovery Group, LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, John P Kenosian, retained for Asset Capital Recovery Group, LLC . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support of Red in uced Filing Fee (Bus & Prof. Code 6322.1) filed by Asset Capital Recovery Group, LLC. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    Read MoreRead Less