This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 09/23/2022 at 02:14:49 (UTC).

Asaf Khan vs General Motors, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/10/2022 Asaf Khan filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against General Motors, LLC. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************6984

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Khan, Asaf

Defendant

General Motors, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Delvin, Michael G.

Defendant Attorney

Shugart, Jonathan M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Khan, Asaf.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Complaint

Complaint for Violation of Statutory Obligations filed by Khan, Asaf.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to General Motors, LLC served on 08/11/2022 by Personal Service. $40.00.

Answer

General Motors LLC's Answer to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint filed by General Motors, LLC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participants; Asaf Khan (Plaintiff); General Motors, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Motors LLC's Answer to Plaintiff's Unverified Complaint filed by General Motors, LLC.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketPayment received by LLC General Motors in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 769518.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Jonathan M. Shugart, retained for General Motors, LLC .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to General Motors, LLC served on 08/11/2022 by Personal Service. $40.00.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 02/06/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint for Violation of Statutory Obligations filed by Khan, Asaf.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Khan, Asaf.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Asaf Khan in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 762153.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Michael G. Delvin, retained for Asaf Khan .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHUGART JONATHAN M