This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/06/2018 at 14:54:07 (UTC).

Arrow Financial v Alfaro

Case Summary

On 03/08/2010 Arrow Financial filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Alfaro. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Tracy Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************3883

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tracy Branch Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Arrow Financial Services Llc Assignee Of Washington Mutual Bank

Defendant

Alfaro, Stefanie D

Assignee

Lvnv Funding, Llc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Assignee Attorney

Colclough, Robert J III

 

Court Documents

MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $1,780.74 filed by Lvnv Funding, Llc. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: CONVERSION.

MC050 Substitution of Attorney Civil (Without Court Order)

Substitution of Attorney filed by Lvnv Funding, Llc. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: CONVERSION.

EJ130 Writ of Execution

06/27/2016: EJ130 Writ of Execution

MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

12/21/2015: MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Payment Receipt

06/26/2015: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

10/31/2014: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

07/25/2012: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

03/10/2010: Payment Receipt

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

03/10/2010: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2016
  • Writ of Execution issued as to Stefanie D Alfaro on 12/30/2016 to Stanislaus County. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • Payment received by Llc Lvnv Funding in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 130352. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney filed by Lvnv Funding, Llc. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $1,780.74 filed by Lvnv Funding, Llc. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Attorney, Robert J Colclough III, retained for Lvnv Funding, Llc . Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • Writ of Execution issued as to Stefanie D Alfaro on 12/14/2015 to Orange County. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • Payment received by in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 14770. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $200.50, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $1573.32 filed by Arrow Financial Services Llc Assignee Of Washington Mutual Bank. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Writ has been updated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Writ of Execution Returned (wholly unsatisfied) filed by Arrow Financial Services LLC Assignee of Washington Mutual Bank on 06/26/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2010
  • Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2010
  • Case has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2010
  • Volume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 03/08/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2010
  • Payment received for 137 - Complaint or other 1st paper <=$10K in the amount of 205.00 on 03/10/2010, transaction number 493588 and receipt number 116104. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2010
  • Address for Erica Brachfeld selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2010
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2010
  • Case assigned to Department T1. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2010
  • Original Summons filed by Arrow Financial Services LLC Assignee of Washington Mutual Bank on 03/08/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Arrow Financial Services LLC Assignee of Washington Mutual Bank on 03/08/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2010
  • Complaint filed by Arrow Financial Services LLC Assignee of Washington Mutual Bank on 03/08/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less