This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 01/13/2023 at 01:23:08 (UTC).

Arlindo Gomes vs Michael Pires, individually and as Administrator of the Estate of Ramon Famoso aka Ray Famoso

Case Summary

On 02/16/2022 Arlindo Gomes filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Michael Pires, individually and as Administrator of the Estate of Ramon Famoso aka Ray Famoso. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1205

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Gomes, Arlindo.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gomes, Arlindo.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Michael Pires, individually and as Administrator of the Estate of Ramon Famoso aka Ray Famoso served on 02/25/2022 by Personal Service. $75.00.

Answer

Answer to Complaint For Breach of Contract To Make A Will filed by Michael Pires, individually and as Administrator of the Estate of Ramon Famoso aka Ray Famoso.

CM-110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Michael Pires, individually and as Administrator of the Estate of Ramon Famoso aka Ray Famoso.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Gomes, Arlindo.

Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Require Plaintiff to File an Undertaking filed by Michael Pires, individually and as Administrator of the Estate of Ramon Famoso aka Ray Famoso.

Declaration

Declaration of Matthew J. Weber in Support of Motion to Require Plaintiff to File an Undertaking Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Code Section 1030 filed by Michael Pires, individually and as Administrator of the Estate of Ramon Famoso aka Ray Famoso.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities of Motion to Require Plaintiff to File an Undertaking Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Code Section 1030 filed by Michael Pires, individually and as Administrator of the Estate of Ramon Famoso aka Ray Famoso.

Motion

Notice of Motion to Require Plaintiff to File an Undertaking Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Code Section 1030 filed by Michael Pires, individually and as Administrator of the Estate of Ramon Famoso aka Ray Famoso.

Proof of Service

Proof of service filed by Michael Pires, individually and as Administrator of the Estate of Ramon Famoso aka Ray Famoso.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/11/2022 08:45 AM .

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal With Prejudice - Entire Action as to Arlindo Gomes, Michael Pires, individually and as Administrator of the Estate of Ramon Famoso aka Ray Famoso Entered.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Gomes, Arlindo.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10B; Result: Vacated; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; Arlindo Gomes (Plaintiff); Michael Pires, individually and as Administrator of the Estate of Ramon Famoso aka Ray Famoso (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion; Court Room: 10B; Result: Vacated; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; Michael Pires, individually and as Administrator of the Estate of Ramon Famoso aka Ray Famoso (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal With Prejudice - Entire Action as to Arlindo Gomes, Michael Pires, individually and as Administrator of the Estate of Ramon Famoso aka Ray Famoso Entered.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Gomes, Arlindo.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10B; Result: Held; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; Arlindo Gomes (Plaintiff); Michael Pires, individually and as Administrator of the Estate of Ramon Famoso aka Ray Famoso (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 11/16/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/11/2022 08:45 AM .; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Jennifer Williams, retained for Michael Pires, individually and as Administrator of the Estate of Ramon Famoso aka Ray Famoso .; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Michael Pires, individually and as Administrator of the Estate of Ramon Famoso aka Ray Famoso served on 02/25/2022 by Personal Service. $75.00.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/11/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Fred A Silva, retained for Arlindo Gomes .; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Gomes, Arlindo.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gomes, Arlindo.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Arlindo Gomes in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 717434.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less