This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 12:06:05 (UTC).

Ariadne Ehrich vs City of Stockton

Case Summary

On 05/13/2016 Ariadne Ehrich filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against City of Stockton. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************4682

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ehrich, Ariadne

Defendant

City of Stockton

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daugherty, Lori Mae

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Ariadne Ehrich, City of Stockton Entered. Previously Dismissed Without Prejudice 03/01, Per Min Order Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 03/01/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Request for Dismissal held on 02/15/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Request for Dismissal held on 12/07/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM200 Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

Notice of Settlement - Conditional filed by Ehrich, Ariadne. Action Type: Notice of Settlement - Conditional; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 02/15/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 11/09/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ehrich, Ariadne. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Ehrich, Ariadne. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2017
  • Request for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Ehrich, Ariadne. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Ariadne Ehrich, City of Stockton Entered. Previously Dismissed Without Prejudice 03/01, Per Min Order Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on March 1, 2017. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 03/01/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Hearing Result: Dropped Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Request for Dismissal held on 02/15/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 02/15/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement - Conditional filed by Ehrich, Ariadne. Action Type: Notice of Settlement - Conditional; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Request for Dismissal held on 12/07/2016 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2016
  • Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on November 9, 2016. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court's OSC RE Dismissal for failure to appear at CMC hearing., set for 12/07/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 11/09/2016 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ehrich, Ariadne. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • Payment received by Ariadne Ehrich in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 60276. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Ehrich, Ariadne. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • Attorney, Lori Mae Daugherty, retained for Ariadne Ehrich . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less