This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 01/15/2020 at 05:52:41 (UTC).

Antony Mladineo et al. vs Wine & Roses, LLC, a limited liability corporation

Case Summary

On 02/26/2019 Antony Mladineo filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Wine Roses, LLC, a limited liability corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kronlund, Barbara and Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************2629

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kronlund, Barbara

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gadis, Jermaine

Mladineo, Antony

Morgan, Sharon

Jimenez, Jose

Defendant

Wine & Roses, LLC, a limited liability corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kozina, Vladimir J.

Defendant Attorney

Flesher, Jacob Daniel

 

Court Documents

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 12/24/2019 08:30 AM . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Wine & Roses, LLC, a limited liability corporation. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Wine & Roses, LLC, a limited liability corporation served on 03/08/2019 by Substituted Service. $0.00. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Wine & Roses, LLC, a limited liability corporation. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gadis, Jermaine; Mladineo, Antony; Morgan, Sharon; Jimenez, Jose. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Morgan, Sharon; Gadis, Jermaine; Jimenez, Jose; Mladineo, Antony. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Order

Order of Prejudice/ Peremptory Challenge Pursuant to CCP 170.6 GRANTED. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Peremptory Challenge

Declaration of prejudice pursuant to 170.6 CCP as to Judge Kronlund filed by Anthony Mladineo, Sharon Morgan, Jermaine Gadis, Jose Jimenez,. Action Type: Declaration of Prejudice/ Peremptory Challenge Pursuant to CCP 170.6; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Further Case Management Conference , set for 02/25/2020 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Michael Mulvihill in Department 10C. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Further Case Management Conference held on 12/24/2019 08:30 AM . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketHearing re: Further Case Management Conference held on December 24, 2019. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketPayment received by LLC, Wine & Roses in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 508718. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Wine & Roses, LLC, a limited liability corporation. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Further Case Management Conference , set for 12/24/2019 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Michael Mulvihill in Department 10C. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/26/2019 08:30 AM . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on August 26, 2019. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Wine & Roses, LLC, a limited liability corporation. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Morgan, Sharon; Gadis, Jermaine; Jimenez, Jose; Mladineo, Antony. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/26/2019 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gadis, Jermaine; Mladineo, Antony; Morgan, Sharon; Jimenez, Jose. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Vladimir J. Kozina, retained for Jose Jimenez . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Vladimir J. Kozina, retained for Jermaine Gadis . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Vladimir J. Kozina, retained for Sharon Morgan . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Vladimir J. Kozina, retained for Antony Mladineo . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Gadis, Jermaine; Mladineo, Antony; Morgan, Sharon; Jimenez, Jose. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Antony Mladineo in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 392502. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wine & Roses, LLC a California limited liability company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLESHER JACOB D.