This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 05/23/2022 at 14:33:01 (UTC).

Antonio Hernandez Espino aka Antonio Hernandez et al. vs Sanborn Chevrolet , Inc. a California Corporation et al.

Case Summary

On 12/07/2021 Antonio Hernandez Espino aka Antonio Hernandez filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sanborn Chevrolet , Inc a California Corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Waters, Robert T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1113

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Waters, Robert T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Antonio Hernandez Espino aka Antonio Hernandez

Elvia Gonzalez Hernandez AKA Elvia T. Hernandez

Defendants

General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company

Sanborn Chevrolet , Inc. a California Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mikhov, Steve B.

Defendant Attorney

Major, Cameron

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Antonio Hernandez Espino aka Antonio Hernandez; Elvia Gonzalez Hernandez AKA Elvia T. Hernandez.

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Antonio Hernandez Espino aka Antonio Hernandez; Elvia Gonzalez Hernandez AKA Elvia T. Hernandez.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Antonio Hernandez Espino aka Antonio Hernandez; Elvia Gonzalez Hernandez AKA Elvia T. Hernandez.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Sanborn Chevrolet , Inc. a California Corporation served on 02/10/2022 by Substituted Service. $70.00.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company served on 02/01/2022 by Personal Service. $30.00.

Answer

First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participants; Antonio Hernandez Espino aka Antonio Hernandez (Plaintiff); Elvia Gonzalez Hernandez AKA Elvia T. Hernandez (Plaintiff); General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Sanborn Chevrolet , Inc. a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketPayment received by a General Motors LLC in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 731116.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Cameron Major, retained for General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to General Motors LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company served on 02/01/2022 by Personal Service. $30.00.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Sanborn Chevrolet , Inc. a California Corporation served on 02/10/2022 by Substituted Service. $70.00.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 06/03/2022 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Antonio Hernandez Espino aka Antonio Hernandez in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 701223.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by Antonio Hernandez Espino aka Antonio Hernandez; Elvia Gonzalez Hernandez AKA Elvia T. Hernandez.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Antonio Hernandez Espino aka Antonio Hernandez; Elvia Gonzalez Hernandez AKA Elvia T. Hernandez.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Antonio Hernandez Espino aka Antonio Hernandez; Elvia Gonzalez Hernandez AKA Elvia T. Hernandez.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Steve B. Mikhov, retained for Elvia Gonzalez Hernandez AKA Elvia T. Hernandez .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Steve B. Mikhov, retained for Antonio Hernandez Espino aka Antonio Hernandez .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant