This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/30/2018 at 20:51:05 (UTC).

Anthony Holloway vs. Matthew Webb

Case Summary

On 08/09/2012 Anthony Holloway filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Matthew Webb. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************9735

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Holloway, Anthony

Defendant

Webb, Matthew

 

Court Documents

EJ130 Writ of Execution

09/06/2012: EJ130 Writ of Execution

EJ130 Writ of Execution

08/17/2012: EJ130 Writ of Execution

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

08/17/2012: UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Payment Receipt

08/17/2012: Payment Receipt

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

08/15/2012: CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

MC030 Declaration

08/15/2012: MC030 Declaration

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

08/15/2012: POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Notice That You've Been Sued

08/10/2012: Notice That You've Been Sued

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

08/09/2012: SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/09/2012: CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

UD100 Complaint

08/09/2012: UD100 Complaint

Notice that you have been sued

08/09/2012: Notice that you have been sued

Payment Receipt

08/09/2012: Payment Receipt

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2013
  • location changed from Courthouse to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2012
  • Case security level updated to 1 effective . Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2012
  • Writ has been updated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2012
  • Milestone of Disposition 30 days met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2012
  • Milestone of Disposition 45 days met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2012
  • Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2012
  • Complaint (OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE) associated on 08/17/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2012
  • Automatic UD Disposition Clock stopped. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2012
  • Automatic Proof of Service Clock stopped. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2012
  • Complaint associated on 08/17/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2012
  • Volume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 08/09/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • Case initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • Automatic UD Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • Automatic Failure to File Default Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • Automatic Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • Case assigned to Department M2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • Original Summons filed by Holloway, Anthony on 08/09/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Holloway, Anthony on 08/09/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2012
  • Complaint filed by Holloway, Anthony on 08/09/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less