This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 10/29/2019 at 02:55:48 (UTC).

Andrey Kukushkin vs Med Thrive Cooperative, Inc. dba Medithrive, Inc., a California Corporation et al.

Case Summary

On 02/13/2018 Andrey Kukushkin filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Med Thrive Cooperative, Inc dba Medithrive, Inc , a California Corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************1646

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kukushkin, Andrey

Defendants

Venture Rebel, Inc., a California Corporation

Linden, Jeffrey

Javid, Arman

Med Thrive Cooperative, Inc. dba Medithrive, Inc., a California Corporation

Breyburg, Misha

Plotitsa, Sasha

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Schoech, Matthew R.

Defendant Attorney

Mazer, Marc S.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Transmittal

Notice of Transmittal. Action Type: Change of Venue-Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Med Thrive Cooperative, Inc. dba Medithrive, Inc., a California Corporation served on 03/08/2018 by Personal Service. $50.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation & Order Granting Motion To Change Venue And Transferring Venue To San Francisco Superior Court entered and filed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Kukushkin, Andrey. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Venture Rebel, Inc., a California Corporation served on 03/08/2018 by Personal Service. . Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address of Counsel filed by Venture Rebel, Inc., a California Corporation; Plotitsa, Sasha; Breyburg, Misha; Med Thrive Cooperative, Inc. dba Medithrive, Inc., a California Corporation. Action Type: Notice of Change of Address; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Change Venue filed by Breyburg, Misha; Med Thrive Cooperative, Inc. dba Medithrive, Inc., a California Corporation; Plotitsa, Sasha; Venture Rebel, Inc., a California Corporation. Action Type: Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration in Support

Declaration of Alexander Plotitsa (Also Known as Sasha Plotitsa) in Support of Motion to Change Venue filed by Breyburg, Misha; Med Thrive Cooperative, Inc. dba Medithrive, Inc., a California Corporation; Plotitsa, Sasha; Venture Rebel, Inc., a California Corporation. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Ross, Roger.

04/11/18

Clerk's Certificate and Receipt for Transfer of Records. Action Type: Change of Venue-Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Motion to Change Venue

Notice of Motion to Change Venue filed by Breyburg, Misha; Med Thrive Cooperative, Inc. dba Medithrive, Inc., a California Corporation; Plotitsa, Sasha; Venture Rebel, Inc., a California Corporation. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Misha Breyburg served on 03/16/2018 by Substituted Service. $90.00. INVALID DUE DILIGENCE IS NOT CORRECT Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Certified Mail Receipt

Certified Mail Receipt filed by Kukushkin, Andrey. Action Type: Certified Mail Receipt; Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Arman Javid served on 03/16/2018 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Order

Case Management Order continuing Case Management Conference re Confirm transfer to SF Superior Court from 8/13/18 to 10/31/18 filed re Andrey Kukushkin, Med Thrive Cooperative, Inc. dba Medithrive, Inc., a California Corporation, Venture Rebel, Inc., a California Corporation, Misha Breyburg, Sasha Plotitsa, Jeffrey Linden, Arman Javid. Judge: Ross, Roger.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Sasha Plotitsa served on 03/07/2018 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2018
  • Hearing Result: Dropped Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Order continuing Case Management Conference re Confirm transfer to SF Superior Court from 8/13/18 to 10/31/18 filed re Andrey Kukushkin, Med Thrive Cooperative, Inc. dba Medithrive, Inc., a California Corporation, Venture Rebel, Inc., a California Corporation, Misha Breyburg, Sasha Plotitsa, Jeffrey Linden, Arman Javid. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference re Confirm transfer to SF Superior Court, set for 10/31/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Case Management Conference re confirm transfer to SF Superior Court scheduled on 08/13/2018 at 8:30 AM has been Continued. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Certified Mail Receipt filed by Kukushkin, Andrey. Action Type: Certified Mail Receipt; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Case status updated to Transferred. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate and Receipt for Transfer of Records. Action Type: Change of Venue-Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Transmittal. Action Type: Change of Venue-Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Payment received by Andrey Kukushkin in the amount of $50.00. Receipt number 291928. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address of Counsel filed by Venture Rebel, Inc., a California Corporation; Plotitsa, Sasha; Breyburg, Misha; Med Thrive Cooperative, Inc. dba Medithrive, Inc., a California Corporation. Action Type: Notice of Change of Address; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Venture Rebel, Inc., a California Corporation served on 03/08/2018 by Personal Service. . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Med Thrive Cooperative, Inc. dba Medithrive, Inc., a California Corporation served on 03/08/2018 by Personal Service. $50.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/13/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Kukushkin, Andrey. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Kukushkin, Andrey. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Attorney, Matthew R. Schoech, retained for Andrey Kukushkin . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Case initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Payment received by Andrey Kukushkin in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 261335. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less