Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/17/2018 at 11:34:40 (UTC).

Andrew Villanueva vs Alicia J Hipolito

Case Summary

On 01/17/2017 Andrew Villanueva filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Alicia J Hipolito. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0455

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Villanueva, Andrew

Defendant

Hipolito, Alicia J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moore, Roger A

 

Court Documents

POS040 Proof of Service

Proof of service of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Villanueva, Andrew. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice

Notice of Tentative Ruling filed by Villanueva, Andrew. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Holly, Carter.

MC052 Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Villanueva, Andrew. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Judge: Holly, Carter.

MC051 Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Villanueva, Andrew. Action Type: Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 05/21/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 01/22/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/04/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Villanueva, Andrew. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 07/20/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Villanueva, Andrew. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Villanueva, Andrew. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

01/17/2017: Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Villanueva, Andrew. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Tentative Ruling filed by Villanueva, Andrew. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Villanueva, Andrew. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Villanueva, Andrew. Action Type: Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Payment received by Andrew Villanueva in the amount of $60.00. Receipt number 297064. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Hearing regarding: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Pltf's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel, set for 07/18/2018 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 08/20/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 05/21/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on May 21, 2018. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 05/21/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 07/20/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on July 20, 2017. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/20/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 41. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Attorney, Roger A Moore, retained for Andrew Villanueva . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Villanueva, Andrew. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Villanueva, Andrew. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Payment received by Andrew Villanueva in the amount of $370.00. Receipt number 134798. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moore, Roger A