Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/02/2018 at 22:26:52 (UTC).

Andrea Garcia vs. Taylor L Edwards

Case Summary

On 06/21/2011 Andrea Garcia filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Taylor L Edwards. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Lodi Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Urie, Phillip. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************8939

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lodi Branch Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Urie, Phillip

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Garcia, Anthony

Garcia, Andrea

Defendant

Edwards, Taylor L

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment

03/09/2012: Notice of Entry of Judgment

SC222 Order on Request to Make Payments

08/22/2011: SC222 Order on Request to Make Payments

SC220 Request to Make Payments

08/17/2011: SC220 Request to Make Payments

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

08/17/2011: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

08/09/2011: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order

08/08/2011: Minute Order

Minute Order

08/01/2011: Minute Order

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

07/22/2011: SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

06/21/2011: SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

08/22/2011: Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

SC221 Response to Request to Make Payments

08/22/2011: SC221 Response to Request to Make Payments

SC221 Response to Request to Make Payments

08/22/2011: SC221 Response to Request to Make Payments

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

08/22/2011: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

Decision

08/08/2011: Decision

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

07/22/2011: SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

SC120 Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

07/20/2011: SC120 Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Payment Receipt

07/20/2011: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

06/21/2011: Payment Receipt

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2013
  • location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2012
  • The status of Award1 has been updated to Fully Satisfied. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2012
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Garcia, Angela; Garcia, Anthony on 03/09/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2011
  • location changed from Courthouse to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2011
  • Case status updated to Post Judgment effective 09/08/2011 Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2011
  • Automatic Request for Installment Clock has expired. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2011
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2011
  • Order Granting (Request to Make Payments signed by Judge Humphreys) filed by Edwards, Taylor L on 08/22/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2011
  • Response (to request to make payments) filed by Garcia, Anthony on 08/22/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2011
  • Response (to request to make payments) filed by Garcia, Angela on 08/22/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2011
  • Automatic Event Scheduled - Not Heard Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • Automatic Small Claims Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • Automatic Event Scheduled - Not Heard Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • San Joaquin Case Label generated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • San Joaquin Case Label generated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant generated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • Court Trial (SC) - Plfts claim 859.45 cost 30.00 scheduled for 08/01/2011 at 08:15:00 AM in L2 at Lodi. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • Court Trial (SC) - Plfts claim 859.45 cost 30.00 scheduled for 07/25/2011 at 08:15:00 AM in L2 at Lodi. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • Case assigned to Department L2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Garcia, Andrea; Garcia, Anthony on 06/21/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less