Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/15/2018 at 17:37:09 (UTC).

Andrea Evans vs Matthew M Evans

Case Summary

On 08/25/2017 Andrea Evans filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Matthew M Evans. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Appel, Robin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************4696

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Appel, Robin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Evans, Andrea

Respondent

Evans, Matthew M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2018
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • Family Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Request for Default against Matthew M Evans Entered Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Matthew M Evans filed. Served on 09/04/2017. Method of Service: Personal Service Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation filed by Evans, Andrea. Action Type: Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Request to Enter Default - Family Law filed by Evans, Andrea. Action Type: Request to Enter Default - Family Law; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure filed by Evans, Andrea. Action Type: Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Evans, Matthew M. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Evans, Andrea. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Payment received by Andrea Evans in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 203238. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act filed by . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Evans, Andrea. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less