This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 03/14/2023 at 08:11:42 (UTC).

Amy Samantha Allen vs Geoffrey Eugene Allen

Case Summary

On 12/16/2022 Amy Samantha Allen filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Geoffrey Eugene Allen. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Abdallah, George J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1695

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Abdallah, George J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allen, Amy Samantha

Defendant

Allen, Geoffrey Eugene

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Talkov, Scott

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Allen, Amy Samantha.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Allen, Amy Samantha.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Geoffrey Eugene Allen served on 01/08/2023 by Personal Service. $0.00.

Notice of Lis Pendens

Notice of Lis Pendens filed by Allen, Amy Samantha.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Geoffrey Eugene Allen Entered

Notice of Errata

Errata/ Withdrawal of Original Notice of Recording of Pendency of Action Pursuant to CCP 405.30 (Lis Pendens) Filed on January 17, 2023 filed by Allen, Amy Samantha.

Amended Notice

Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Allen, Amy Samantha.

Motion

Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Interlocutory Judgment of Partition and Appointment of Referee; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; Declarations of Amy Samantha Allen, Scott Talkov, and Matthew Taylor filed by Allen, Amy Samantha.

Amended Notice

Plaintiff's Amended Notice of Motion for Interlocutory Judgment of Partition and Appointment of Referee filed by Allen, Amy Samantha.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10A; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participants; Amy Samantha Allen (Plaintiff); Geoffrey Eugene Allen (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion; Court Room: 10A; Judge: George J. Abdallah; Participants; Amy Samantha Allen (Plaintiff); Geoffrey Eugene Allen (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Amended Notice of Motion for Interlocutory Judgment of Partition and Appointment of Referee filed by Allen, Amy Samantha.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Interlocutory Judgment of Partition and Appointment of Referee; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof; Declarations of Amy Samantha Allen, Scott Talkov, and Matthew Taylor filed by Allen, Amy Samantha.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Amy Allen in the amount of $60.00. Receipt number 815125.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Motion Plaintiff's Motion for Interlocutory Judgment of Partition and Appointment of Referee., set for 03/30/2023 at 9:00 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default against Geoffrey Eugene Allen Entered; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Allen, Amy Samantha.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketAmended Notice of Recording of Pendency of Action Pursuant CCP 405.20 filed by Allen, Amy Samantha.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketErrata/ Withdrawal of Original Notice of Recording of Pendency of Action Pursuant to CCP 405.30 (Lis Pendens) Filed on January 17, 2023 filed by Allen, Amy Samantha.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens filed by Allen, Amy Samantha.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Geoffrey Eugene Allen served on 01/08/2023 by Personal Service. $0.00.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 06/15/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. George J. Abdallah in Department 10A.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Allen, Amy Samantha.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Allen, Amy Samantha.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Amy Allen in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 796962.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Scott Talkov, retained for Amy Samantha Allen .; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Abdallah, George J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less