This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/01/2018 at 13:02:08 (UTC).

Amie Grout vs. Wine and Roses LLC

Case Summary

On 12/21/2012 Amie Grout filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Wine and Roses LLC. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lofthus, Linda L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************5738

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lofthus, Linda L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Amie Grout

Grout, Eric

Grout, Amie

Defendants

Wine and Roses LLC

Miscellaneous Participant 1,

Preferred Hotel Group Inc

Miscellaneous Participant,

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

12/27/2012: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

Payment Receipt

12/27/2012: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

03/07/2013: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

03/07/2013: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

03/27/2013: Payment Receipt

Tentative Rulings

04/10/2013: Tentative Rulings

Minute Order

04/11/2013: Minute Order

Minute Order

05/22/2013: Minute Order

Payment Receipt

06/28/2013: Payment Receipt

Minute Order

09/18/2013: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2015
  • location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 5 Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2013
  • location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Staff,Kranich, Tammy L. to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • Milestone of Disposition 24 months met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • Milestone of Disposition 18 months met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • Milestone of Disposition 12 months met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • location changed from Courtrooms,33,Other to Courthouse,Courthouse - Staff,Kranich, Tammy L. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • Status of Eric Grout updated to Dismissed with Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • Status of Amie Grout updated to Dismissed with Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2013
  • Status of Wine and Roses LLC updated to Dismissed with Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2012
  • Case has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • Volume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 12/21/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • Payment received for 194 - Complaint or other 1st paper in the amount of 435.00 on 12/27/2012, transaction number 1099501 and receipt number 292775. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • location changed from Courthouse to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • Case Management Conference - scheduled for 05/22/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in 33 at Stockton Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Lofthus, Linda. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • Original Summons filed by Grout, Amie; Grout, Eric on 12/21/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Grout, Amie; Grout, Eric on 12/21/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2012
  • Complaint filed by Grout, Amie; Grout, Eric on 12/21/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PREFERRED HOTEL GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wine & Roses, LLC a California limited liability company is a litigant