This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 06/17/2022 at 02:28:09 (UTC).

American Medical Response West, a California corporation vs San Joaquin County Health Commission, dba Health Plan of San Joaquin

Case Summary

On 02/16/2022 American Medical Response West, a California corporation filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against San Joaquin County Health Commission, dba Health Plan of San Joaquin. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1207

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

American Medical Response West, a California corporation

Defendant

San Joaquin County Health Commission, dba Health Plan of San Joaquin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Chan, Eric D.

Defendant Attorney

Eaton, Anthony R.

 

Court Documents

Declaration in Support

Declaration Of Lizeth Granados In Support Of Health Plan Of San Joaquin’s Response To Petition To Vacate Arbitration Award; And Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award, And For Entry Of Judgment Against American Medical Response West filed by San Joaquin County Health Commission, dba Health Plan of San Joaquin.

Declaration in Support

Declaration Of Anthony R. Eaton In Support Of Health Plan Of San Joaquin’s Response To Petition To Vacate Arbitration Award; And Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award, And For Entry Of Judgment Against American Medical Response West filed by San Joaquin County Health Commission, dba Health Plan of San Joaquin.

Response

Health Plan Of San Joaquin’s Response To Petition To Vacate Arbitration Award; And Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award, And For Entry Of Judgment Against American Medical Response West (amount over $25,000) filed by San Joaquin County Health Commission, dba Health Plan of San Joaquin.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Personal Service filed by American Medical Response West, a California corporation.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to San Joaquin County Health Commission, dba Health Plan of San Joaquin served on 02/18/2022 by Personal Service. $0.00.

Petition

Unlimited Civil Petition - other (amount over $25,000) filed by American Medical Response West, a California corporation.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Personal Service filed by American Medical Response West, a California corporation.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Personal Service filed by American Medical Response West, a California corporation.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Petition; Court Room: 10B; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; American Medical Response West, a California corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Petition; Court Room: 10B; Result: Continued - Parties Motion; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; American Medical Response West, a California corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Petition , set for 07/28/2022 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketHearing Result: Petition Continued - Parties Motion; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation to Continue Hearing on Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award; Order signed by Judge Guy-Castillo on 04/25/2022 entered and filed.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHealth Plan of San Joaquin's Objections to American Medical Response West's Unauthorized Second Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Petition To Vacate Arbitration Award filed by San Joaquin County Health Commission, dba Health Plan of San Joaquin.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketPayment received by a American Medical Response West in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 732476.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of service filed by American Medical Response West, a California corporation.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Petition , set for 05/04/2022 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award filed by American Medical Response West, a California corporation.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service filed by American Medical Response West, a California corporation.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service filed by American Medical Response West, a California corporation.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to San Joaquin County Health Commission, dba Health Plan of San Joaquin served on 02/18/2022 by Personal Service. $0.00.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by American Medical Response West, a California corporation.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlimited Civil Petition - other (amount over $25,000) filed by American Medical Response West, a California corporation.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketPayment received by a American Medical Response West in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 717449.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Eric D. Chan, retained for American Medical Response West, a California corporation .; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Medical Response West is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EATON, ANTHONY R