This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:45:57 (UTC).

American Lender Servicing vs Tammy R. Myers

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 American Lender Servicing filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Tammy R Myers. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1895

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

American Lender Servicing

Defendant

Myers, Tammy R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patena, Jaime Lao

 

Court Documents

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Tammy R. Myers Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

EJ130 Writ of Execution

Writ of Possession as to Tammy R. Myers (Returned With Full Satisfaction). Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by American Lender Servicing. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by American Lender Servicing. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for American Lender Servicing against Tammy R. Myers filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment as to all occupants filed by American Lender Servicing. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service of Summons and Complaint as to ALL OCCUPANTS filed by American Lender Servicing. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by American Lender Servicing. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Tammy R. Myers served on 02/27/2016. Type of Service Personal. $30.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession as to Tammy R. Myers (Returned With Full Satisfaction). Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Tammy R. Myers on 03/10/2016 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for American Lender Servicing against Tammy R. Myers filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 39196. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by American Lender Servicing. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment as to all occupants filed by American Lender Servicing. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Tammy R. Myers Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by American Lender Servicing. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service of Summons and Complaint as to ALL OCCUPANTS filed by American Lender Servicing. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Tammy R. Myers served on 02/27/2016. Type of Service Personal. $30.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by American Lender Servicing. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by S J Rental Housing Services Corp. in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 34488. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by American Lender Servicing. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Jaime Lao Patena, retained for American Lender Servicing . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less