This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/09/2018 at 04:39:36 (UTC).

American Express Bank FSB a federal savings bank vs. Richard Hyske

Case Summary

On 10/29/2010 American Express Bank FSB a federal savings bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Richard Hyske. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Tracy Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************8188

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bank Of Stockton

Defendant

Hyske, Richard

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

10/29/2010: Payment Receipt

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

10/29/2010: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

Complaint for Damages 1-3

10/29/2010: Complaint for Damages 1-3

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/29/2010: CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

SUM100 Summons - Civil

10/29/2010: SUM100 Summons - Civil

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

12/09/2010: POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

01/06/2011: CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

02/25/2011: CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

02/25/2011: CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Declaration of Brian P. McGurk Re: Copies of Documents in Lieu of Originals; Order Thereon

02/25/2011: Declaration of Brian P. McGurk Re: Copies of Documents in Lieu of Originals; Order Thereon

Declaration of Brian P McGurk Re: Account for Entry of Default Judgment and Brief Summary of Case Pursuant to CRC 3.1800

02/25/2011: Declaration of Brian P McGurk Re: Account for Entry of Default Judgment and Brief Summary of Case Pursuant to CRC 3.1800

Declaration of Brian P. McGurk Re: Accrued Interest

02/25/2011: Declaration of Brian P. McGurk Re: Accrued Interest

Declaration of Brian P. McGurk Re: Open Book Account and in Support of Civil Code-1717 and Superior Court Rule 3-111(A); Order Thereon

04/14/2011: Declaration of Brian P. McGurk Re: Open Book Account and in Support of Civil Code-1717 and Superior Court Rule 3-111(A); Order Thereon

JUD100 Judgment

04/14/2011: JUD100 Judgment

Payment Receipt

06/29/2011: Payment Receipt

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2011
  • DocketAssociation created between Michael, Lina M and American Express Bank FSB a federal savings bank. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • DocketComplaint associated on 06/29/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • DocketPayment received for 141I - Writ in the amount of 25.00 on 06/29/2011, transaction number 818439 and receipt number 219541. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • DocketWrit issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • DocketCosts acknowledged/updated. Judgment total updated to 21566.29. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • DocketPostjudgment interest accrued 331.23. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by American Express Bank FSB a federal savings bank on 06/29/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2011
  • DocketAutomatic Limited Case Disposition Clock expired. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • DocketMilestone of Disposition 18 months met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • DocketMilestone of Disposition 24 months met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2010
  • DocketCase initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • DocketCase initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • DocketAutomatic Limited Case Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • DocketAutomatic Rule 3.740 Collections Failure to File Default Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • DocketAutomatic Rule 3.740 Collecitons Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • DocketSummons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • DocketCase assigned to Department T1. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by American Express Bank FSB a federal savings bank on 10/29/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by American Express Bank FSB a federal savings bank on 10/29/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • DocketComplaint filed by American Express Bank FSB a federal savings bank on 10/29/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less