This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 10:38:03 (UTC).

Amanda Susan Rioux vs Brandon Rioux

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Amanda Susan Rioux filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Brandon Rioux. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0889

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Rioux, Amanda Susan

Respondent

Rioux, Brandon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Butler, Dianne Drew

Respondent Attorney

Bansmer, Erica M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Family Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure filed by Rioux, Amanda Susan. Action Type: Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Appearance, Stipulations, and Waiver-No Fee filed by Rioux, Amanda Susan. Action Type: Appearance, Stipulations, and Waiver-No Fee; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation filed by Rioux, Amanda Susan. Action Type: Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Hearing dropped by Golden Rod Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Hearing Result: Dropped Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Proof of service filed by Rioux, Amanda Susan. Action Type: Proof of Service by Mail; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Petitioner's Trial Brief filed by Rioux, Amanda Susan. Action Type: Trial Brief; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Respondent's Trial Brief Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Request for Order-Initial Petr's RFO Spousal Support, set for 05/12/2016 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Cheryl A. McCann in Department F3. Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Income and Expense Declaration filed by Rioux, Amanda Susan. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • RFO-Request for Order First Paper filed by Rioux, Amanda Susan. Action Type: RFO-Request for Order (First Paper); Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Brandon Rioux filed. Served on 03/08/2016. Method of Service: Personal Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Dianne Drew Butler, retained for Amanda Susan Rioux . Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Amanda Susan Rioux. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Rioux, Amanda Susan. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Rioux, Amanda Susan. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less