This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/17/2018 at 21:57:31 (UTC).

Amanda Gutierrez vs Lodi Memorial Hospital Association

Case Summary

On 06/21/2017 Amanda Gutierrez filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Lodi Memorial Hospital Association. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************6390

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gutierrez, Amanda

Defendants

The Gould Medical Group, Inc., a California Corporation

Nakashima, M.D., Carol

Howen, M.D., Robert

Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, a California Corporation dba Lodi Memorial Hospital

Gould Medical Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fagel, Bruce G.

 

Court Documents

Notice

Plaintiff's Notice Of Taking Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel Off Calendar filed by Gutierrez, Amanda. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Complaint With Prejudice filed by Gutierrez, Amanda. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel held on 08/02/2017 09:00 AM . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of continuance of motion of Plaintiff's counsel to be relieved as counsel

Notice of continuance of motion of Plaintiff's counsel to be relieved as counsel filed by Gutierrez, Amanda. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

MC051 Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Gutierrez, Amanda. Action Type: Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gutierrez, Amanda. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Gutierrez, Amanda. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice to Filing Party

06/21/2017: Notice to Filing Party

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2017
  • Payment received in the amount of $15.00, receipt number 228789. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Notice Of Taking Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel Off Calendar filed by Gutierrez, Amanda. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Amanda Gutierrez, Lodi Memorial Hospital Association, a California Corporation dba Lodi Memorial Hospital, Robert Howen, M.D., Carol Nakashima, M.D., The Gould Medical Group, Inc., a California Corporation, Gould Medical Group, Inc. Entered. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Complaint With Prejudice filed by Gutierrez, Amanda. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • Hearing Result: Dropped Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel , set for 08/30/2017 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of continuance of motion of Plaintiff's counsel to be relieved as counsel filed by Gutierrez, Amanda. Action Type: Notice - (Other); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Hearing re: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel held on August 2, 2017. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Gutierrez, Amanda. Action Type: Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel , set for 08/02/2017 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 12/18/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Elizabeth Humphreys in Department 10C. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Attorney, Bruce G. Fagel, retained for Amanda Gutierrez . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Gutierrez, Amanda. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Gutierrez, Amanda. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Payment received by Amanda Gutierrez in the amount of $585.00. Receipt number 181512. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gould Medical Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAGEL, BRUCE G