This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:41:48 (UTC).

Alice Baratone vs Arrow Construction et al.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Alice Baratone filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Arrow Construction. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************1851

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Baratone, Alice

Defendants

PG&E

Arrow Construction

 

Court Documents

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/29/2016 01:30 PM . Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000 filed by Baratone, Alice. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service as to PG&E (Personal). 52.50 Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SC109 Authorization to Appear

Authorization to Appear filed by PG&E. Jill Polanco. Action Type: Authorization to Appear; Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

SC109 Authorization to Appear

Authorization to Appear filed by Arrow Construction. Mark Faria. Action Type: Authorization to Appear; Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

Corrected Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Corrected Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Memorandum

Memorandum of Costs with Receipts filed by Baratone, Alice. Action Type: Memorandum; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/29/2016 01:30 PM . Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

SC109 Authorization to Appear

Authorization to Appear filed by Arrow Construction. Deon K Bozzo. Action Type: Authorization to Appear; Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

PROOF OF SERVICE

Proof of Service as to Arrow Construction (Substituted service). Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Corrected Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Authorization to Appear filed by PG&E. Jill Polanco. Action Type: Authorization to Appear; Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Authorization to Appear filed by Arrow Construction. Deon K Bozzo. Action Type: Authorization to Appear; Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Authorization to Appear filed by Arrow Construction. Mark Faria. Action Type: Authorization to Appear; Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/29/2016 01:30 PM . Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • Hearing re: Court Trial held on March 29, 2016. Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Court Trial held on 03/29/2016 01:30 PM . Judge: **Baysinger, Robert.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • Small Claims Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs with Receipts filed by Baratone, Alice. Action Type: Memorandum; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service as to PG&E (Personal). 52.50 Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service as to Arrow Construction (Substituted service). Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Court Trial , set for 03/29/2016 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Unassigned in Department J2. principal 10,000.00 costs 75.00 Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $75.00. Receipt number 34082. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000 filed by Baratone, Alice. Action Type: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $5,000 to $10,000; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less