This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 03/11/2023 at 04:00:15 (UTC).

Alfredetta Ward vs Progressive Insurance

Case Summary

On 12/29/2022 Alfredetta Ward filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Progressive Insurance. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Rasmussen, Michael J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************2219

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Rasmussen, Michael J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ward, Alfredetta

Defendant

Progressive Insurance

 

Court Documents

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000 filed by Ward, Alfredetta.

Request for Certified Mail

Request for Certified Mail filed by Ward, Alfredetta.

Request for Certified Mail

Request for Certified Mail filed by Ward, Alfredetta.

Certified Mail Receipt

Proof of Service (SC) as to Progressive Insurance served on 01/09/2023 by Certified Mail. .

Certified Mail Receipt

Proof of Service (SC) returned Unserved as to Progressive Insurance. Costs

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: 3A; Judge: Michael J. Rasmussen; Participants; Alfredetta Ward (Plaintiff); Progressive Insurance (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (SC) returned Unserved as to Progressive Insurance. Costs; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (SC) as to Progressive Insurance served on 01/09/2023 by Certified Mail. .; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketPayment received in the amount of $3.00, receipt number 800955.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Certified Mail filed by Ward, Alfredetta.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Certified Mail filed by Ward, Alfredetta.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Alfredetta Ward in the amount of $15.00. Receipt number 799829.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Court Trial Principle $3,454.00 / Costs $50.00, set for 04/10/2023 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Michael J. Rasmussen in Department 3A.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court Over $1,500 to $5,000 filed by Ward, Alfredetta.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Alfredetta Ward in the amount of $50.00. Receipt number 799758.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Rasmussen, Michael J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less