This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 09/19/2021 at 06:46:45 (UTC).

Alexia Martinez Rojas vs Anthony John Garcia

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 Alexia Martinez Rojas filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Anthony John Garcia. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Appel, Robin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0546

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Appel, Robin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Martinez Rojas, Alexia

Respondent

Garcia, Anthony John

Not Classified By Court

Wolf - 2019, Sarah

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Scardigli, Nicholas John

Respondent Attorney

Butler, Dianne Drew

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record filed by Garcia, Anthony John. Action Type: Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order for Family Law entered and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Anthony Garcia in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 675068. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ruling on Submitted Matter held on 06/24/2021 02:15 PM . Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Mediation; Court Room: 4A; Result: Held; Judge: Robin Appel; Participant: Alexia Martinez Rojas (Petitioner); Participant: Anthony John Garcia (Respondent); Participant: Sarah Wolf - 2019 (Mediator)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Mediation held on 06/15/2021 01:30 PM . Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketHearing re: Mediation held on June 15, 2021. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration filed by Garcia, Anthony John. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration filed by Martinez Rojas, Alexia. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketFindings and Orders After Hearing as to Alexia Martinez Rojas, Anthony John Garcia Entered. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Dianne Drew Butler, retained for Anthony John Garcia . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of DVTRO as to Anthony John Garcia served on 02/20/2021 by Personal Service. . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration filed by Martinez Rojas, Alexia. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 02/17/2021. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Alexia Martinez Rojas. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Domestic Violence Restraining Order TRO ( Alexia Rojas ), set for 03/11/2021 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Robin Appel in Department 4A. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Nicholas John Scardigli, retained for Alexia Martinez Rojas . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Re: Ex Parte Application. Action Type: Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order with Children; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Domestic Violence Restraining Order with Children filed by Martinez Rojas, Alexia. Action Type: Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order with Children; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Butler, Dianne Drew