Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/24/2018 at 01:26:49 (UTC).

Akhtar Ali vs. Arnaiz Development Co., Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2009 Akhtar Ali filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against Arnaiz Development Co , Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1859

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Keo, Lot

Green, Eugene

Webb, Tyler R

Thach, Terry

Riehle, Sylvia

Murillo, Daniel

Torres, Arsenio

Vargas, Sylvia

Basa, Michael G

Shelton, Deanna

Zavala, Gregory

Webb, Eunice C

Becerra, Luis J

Newman, Michael

Canela, Daniel

Cross Defendants

Miscellaneous Participant 43

Bdl Painting, Inc.

Obyssey Environmental Services, Inc.

Hank & Tony'S Inc.

Heederih, Gary

333 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

05/01/2014: Minute Order

Payment Receipt

06/12/2013: Payment Receipt

Minute Order

07/29/2011: Minute Order

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

03/03/2011: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Case History Notice

12/10/2010: Case History Notice

Payment Receipt

11/04/2010: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

10/22/2010: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

07/30/2009: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

12/08/2008: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

10/03/2013: Payment Receipt

Notice of Case Reassignment

04/15/2011: Notice of Case Reassignment

Tentative Rulings

03/08/2011: Tentative Rulings

Payment Receipt - Void

12/10/2010: Payment Receipt - Void

Notice of Case Reassignment

03/09/2010: Notice of Case Reassignment

Minute Order

12/08/2009: Minute Order

Tentative Rulings

10/20/2009: Tentative Rulings

Minute Order

06/09/2009: Minute Order

Minute Order

05/07/2009: Minute Order

94 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2015
  • location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 5 to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 5 to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 5 to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 5 to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 5 to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 5 to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 5 to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2015
  • location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 5 to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • location changed from Courtrooms,33,Other to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 5 Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
8,486 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2008
  • Payment received for 26 - Complaint or other 1st paper 35 - Complex case fee response in the amount of 870.00 on 12/08/2008, transaction number 230670 and receipt number 39381. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2008
  • Association created between Lee Jackson and Yasmeen Ali. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2008
  • Status of Yasmeen Ali updated to Active/Represented. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2008
  • Status of Yasmeen Ali updated to Active/Represented. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2008
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2008
  • Case Management Conference - scheduled for 05/07/2009 at 08:45:00 AM in 32 at Stockton Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2008
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Thomasson, Lauren. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2008
  • Designated a complex action on 12/08/2008. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2008
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ali, Akhtar; Ali, Yasmeen on 12/08/2008. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2008
  • Complaint filed by Ali, Akhtar; Ali, Yasmeen on 12/08/2008. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where B.D.L. Painting is a litigant

Latest cases where Hank & Tony'S, Inc. is a litigant