This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/18/2018 at 08:43:45 (UTC).

Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc. vs Shondra Lee Jaime et al.

Case Summary

On 12/11/2017 Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Shondra Lee Jaime. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott, W. Stephen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************3220

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Scott, W. Stephen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc.

Defendants

Michael Paul Jaime aka Michael Paul Jaime Sr.

Jaime, Shondra Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Struck, James D.

 

Court Documents

MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $250.72 filed by Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc.. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

JUD100 Judgment

Judgment for Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc. against Shondra Lee Jaime, Michael Paul Jaime aka Michael Paul Jaime Sr. in the amount of 24082.72. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

Declaration of Loretta R. Fernandes in Support of Court Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585

Declaration of Loretta R. Fernandes in Support of Court Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc.. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Shondra Lee Jaime, Michael Paul Jaime aka Michael Paul Jaime Sr. Entered. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

Amended proof of service of s & c as to DEFT Shondra Lee Jaime by substitute service

Amended proof of service of s & c as to DEFT Shondra Lee Jaime by substitute service on 2/8/18 filed by Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc.. Fee $35.00 Action Type: Amended; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

Amended proof of service of s & c as to DEFT Shondra Lee Jaime by substitute service

Amended proof of service of s & c as to DEFT Shondra Lee Jaime by substitute service on 12/22/17 filed by Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc.. Fee $70.00 Action Type: Amended; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

Amended proof of service of s & c as to DEFT Michael Paul Jaime aka Michael Paul Jaime Sr. by substitute service

Amended proof of service of s & c as to DEFT Michael Paul Jaime aka Michael Paul Jaime Sr. by substitute service on 12/22/17 filed by Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc.. Fee $60.00 Action Type: Amended; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

Notice to Filing Party

04/05/2018: Notice to Filing Party

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Shondra Lee Jaime, Michael Paul Jaime aka Michael Paul Jaime Sr. Not Entered Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service as to Shondra Lee Jaime filed by Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc.. $70.00 Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Shondra Lee Jaime served on 02/08/2018 by Substituted Service. $35.00. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Michael Paul Jaime aka Michael Paul Jaime Sr. served on 12/22/2017 by Substituted Service. $60.00. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service

Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service as to Shondra Lee Jaime filed by Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc.. $35.00 Action Type: Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

Complaint

Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc.. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2018
  • Writ of Execution issued as to Michael Paul Jaime aka Michael Paul Jaime Sr. on 06/22/2018 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Writ of Execution issued as to Shondra Lee Jaime on 06/22/2018 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Payment received by Inc. Affiliated Consumer Control in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 306035. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $250.72 filed by Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc.. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc. against Shondra Lee Jaime, Michael Paul Jaime aka Michael Paul Jaime Sr. in the amount of 24082.72. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Hearing Result: CMC Vacated Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Shondra Lee Jaime, Michael Paul Jaime aka Michael Paul Jaime Sr. Entered. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Loretta R. Fernandes in Support of Court Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc.. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default and Court Default Judgment filed by Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc.. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Shondra Lee Jaime served on 02/08/2018 by Substituted Service. $35.00. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Michael Paul Jaime aka Michael Paul Jaime Sr. served on 12/22/2017 by Substituted Service. $60.00. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service as to Shondra Lee Jaime filed by Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc.. $35.00 Action Type: Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service as to Shondra Lee Jaime filed by Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc.. $70.00 Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 06/08/2018 at 8:30 AM before Hon. W. Stephen Scott in Department 10A. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc.. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Scott, W. Stephen.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Affiliated Consumer Control, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Struck, James D.