This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 09/19/2021 at 05:53:50 (UTC).

Adonne Shelby vs Greenline Transport Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2021 Adonne Shelby filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Greenline Transport Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************4064

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shelby, Adonne

Defendants

Smartway Logistics Inc.

Greenline Transport Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scardigli, Nicholas John

 

Court Documents

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Greenline Transport Inc. served on 09/03/2021 by Substituted Service. $0.00. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Smartway Logistics Inc. served on 08/27/2021 by Substituted Service. $0.00. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Amended Complaint

First Amended Complaint For Damages and Penalties filed by Shelby, Adonne. Action Type: Amended Complaint; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons as to Smartway Logistics Inc. served on 05/13/2021 by Substituted Service. $0.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons as to Greenline Transport Inc. served on 05/13/2021 by Substituted Service. $0.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Shelby, Adonne. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Shelby, Adonne. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participant: Adonne Shelby (Plaintiff); Participant: Greenline Transport Inc. (Defendant); Participant: Smartway Logistics Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Greenline Transport Inc. served on 09/03/2021 by Substituted Service. $0.00. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Smartway Logistics Inc. served on 08/27/2021 by Substituted Service. $0.00. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint For Damages and Penalties filed by Shelby, Adonne. Action Type: Amended Complaint; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Smartway Logistics Inc. served on 05/13/2021 by Substituted Service. $0.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Greenline Transport Inc. served on 05/13/2021 by Substituted Service. $0.00. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 11/04/2021 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Shelby, Adonne. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Shelby, Adonne. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Adonne Shelby in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 643301. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Nicholas John Scardigli, retained for Adonne Shelby . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCARDIGLI, NICHOLAS J.