This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/18/2018 at 03:21:46 (UTC).

Acampo Arbor Limited, A California Limited Partnership vs Jason Elliott

Case Summary

On 09/15/2017 Acampo Arbor Limited, A California Limited Partnership filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Jason Elliott. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Lodi Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Urie, Phillip. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************9733

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lodi Branch Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Urie, Phillip

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Acampo Arbor Limited, A California Limited Partnership

Defendant

Elliott, Jason

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carroll, Joseph W.

 

Court Documents

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Jason Elliott served on 10/11/2017 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Acampo Arbor Limited, A California Limited Partnership against Jason Elliott filed and entered Judgment does not apply to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Urie, Phillip.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Does filed by Acampo Arbor Limited, A California Limited Partnership. Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Acampo Arbor Limited, A California Limited Partnership. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Jason Elliott Entered Judge: Urie, Phillip.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Jason Elliott served on 09/16/2017 by Personal Service. $55.00. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service as to all occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46 filed by Acampo Arbor Limited, A California Limited Partnership with service fee of $45.00. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Acampo Arbor Limited, A California Limited Partnership. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Urie, Phillip.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Acampo Arbor Limited, A California Limited Partnership. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

UnlawfulDetainerNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession as to Jason Elliott served on 10/11/2017 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Jason Elliott on 09/27/2017 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Payment received by A Acampo Arbor Limited in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 214392. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Acampo Arbor Limited, A California Limited Partnership against Jason Elliott filed and entered Judgment does not apply to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Jason Elliott Entered Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Acampo Arbor Limited, A California Limited Partnership. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Acampo Arbor Limited, A California Limited Partnership. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Does filed by Acampo Arbor Limited, A California Limited Partnership. Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service as to all occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46 filed by Acampo Arbor Limited, A California Limited Partnership with service fee of $45.00. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Jason Elliott served on 09/16/2017 by Personal Service. $55.00. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Attorney, Joseph W. Carroll, retained for Acampo Arbor Limited, A California Limited Partnership . Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Acampo Arbor Limited, A California Limited Partnership. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Acampo Arbor Limited, A California Limited Partnership. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Payment received by A Acampo Arbor Limited in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 209907. Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Urie, Phillip.

    Read MoreRead Less