This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 19:24:52 (UTC).

Abdul H. Alocozy vs Diamond Cortez et al.

Case Summary

On 09/26/2018 Abdul H Alocozy filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Diamond Cortez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************2058

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alocozy, Abdul H.

Defendants

Cortez, Diamond

Martin, Jack

 

Court Documents

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UnlawfulDetainerNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Alocozy, Abdul H.. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Alocozy, Abdul H.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Proof of Service

Proof of service as to Jack Martin filed by Alocozy, Abdul H. Proof submitted states service was Personal, but appears to be Substituted Service. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Proof of Service

Proof of service as Diamond Cortez filed by Alocozy, Abdul H. Proof submitted states service was Personal, but appears to be Substituted Service. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Amended Proof of Service of Summons as to Diamond Cortez served on 10/01/2018 by Substituted Service. $30.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Amended Proof of Service of Summons as to Jack Martin served on 10/01/2018 by Substituted Service. $30.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Alocozy, Abdul H.. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Diamond Cortez, Jack Martin Denied. Filed prematurely. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice to Filing Party

Request for Default against Diamond Cortez, Jack Martin Denied. Filed prematurely. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Alocozy, Abdul H.. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Abdul H. Alocozy against Jack Martin filed and entered Judgment does not apply to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Diamond Cortez and Jack Martin served on 11/06/2018 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/26/2019

Case status updated to Closed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2018
View Court Documents

Writ of Possession as to Diamond Cortez and Jack Martin served on 11/06/2018 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2018

Writ of Possession issued as to Diamond Cortez and Jack Martin on 10/22/2018 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2018

Payment received by Abdul Alocozy in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 349014. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2018

Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2018
View Court Documents

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Abdul H. Alocozy against Jack Martin filed and entered Judgment does not apply to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2018
View Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Alocozy, Abdul H.. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2018

Request for Default against Diamond Cortez, Jack Martin ~~Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2018
View Court Documents

Request for Default against Diamond Cortez, Jack Martin Denied. Filed prematurely. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2018

Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Alocozy, Abdul H.. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
10/02/2018
View Court Documents

Proof of service as to Jack Martin filed by Alocozy, Abdul H. Proof submitted states service was Personal, but appears to be Substituted Service. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2018
View Court Documents

Proof of service as Diamond Cortez filed by Alocozy, Abdul H. Proof submitted states service was Personal, but appears to be Substituted Service. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2018

Amended Proof of Service of Summons as to Jack Martin served on 10/01/2018 by Substituted Service. $30.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2018
View Court Documents

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Alocozy, Abdul H.. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2018
View Court Documents

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2018
View Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Alocozy, Abdul H.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2018

Payment received by Abdul Alocozy in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 339719. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2018
View Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2018
View Court Documents

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2018

Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less