Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 05/11/2021 at 02:29:17 (UTC).

Abdo Mohamad vs Brooke Thompson et al.

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 Abdo Mohamad filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against Brooke Thompson. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0381

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mohamad, Abdo

Defendants

Azevedo, Jeremy

Thompson, Brooke

Other

All Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rowe, Anthony Drew

 

Court Documents

Declaration of Non-Compliance

Declaration of Non-Compliance and Request to Issue Writ of Execution and to Unseal this Case filed by Mohamad, Abdo. Action Type: Declaration of Non Service; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

UnlawfulDetainerNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Mohamad, Abdo. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mohamad, Abdo. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

UD101 Plaintiff's Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations - Unlawful Detainer

Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet filed by Mohamad, Abdo. Action Type: Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Mohamad, Abdo. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Abdo Mohamad against Brooke Thompson, Jeremy Azevedo filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Brooke Thompson served on 12/17/2020 by Substituted Service. $45.00. - AMENDED. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Brooke Thompson served on 12/17/2020 by Substituted Service. $45.00. - SECOND Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Notice to Filing Party

Request for Default against Brooke Thompson, All Occupants Not Entered Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Summons returned UNSERVED as to Brooke Thompson. Costs $0.00 - Page 2 is incomplete. Item #6, 7, and 8 are not marked. Missing date, and printed name. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Mohamad, Abdo. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Brooke Thompson Not Entered Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Notice to Filing Party

Request for Default against Jeremy Azevedo Entered Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Jeremy Azevedo served on 12/17/2020 by Personal Service. $45.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Jeremy Azevedo Entered Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued as to Brooke Thompson and Jeremy Azevedo on 03/16/2021 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Abdo Mohamad in the amount of $40.00. Receipt number 629738. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Mohamad, Abdo. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Abdo Mohamad against Brooke Thompson, Jeremy Azevedo filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default against Brooke Thompson, All Occupants Entered Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Compliance and Request to Issue Writ of Execution and to Unseal this Case filed by Mohamad, Abdo. Action Type: Declaration of Non Service; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Mohamad, Abdo. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Brooke Thompson served on 12/17/2020 by Substituted Service. $45.00. - AMENDED. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Mohamad, Abdo. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default - Civil filed by Mohamad, Abdo. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default - Civil; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mohamad, Abdo. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketAttorney, Anthony Drew Rowe, retained for Abdo Mohamad . Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet filed by Mohamad, Abdo. Action Type: Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Mohamad, Abdo. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketPayment received by Abdo Mohamad in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 606192. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rowe, Anthony Drew