Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 19:19:39 (UTC).

Abbey Pointe LLC vs Ryan Johnson

Case Summary

On 09/14/2016 Abbey Pointe LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Ryan Johnson. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************9215

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Abbey Pointe LLC

Defendant

Johnson, Ryan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Echols, Paul E

 

Court Documents

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Judgment for Abbey Pointe LLC against Ryan Johnson in the amount of $1775.89. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration

Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Abbey Pointe LLC. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Abbey Pointe LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Amendment to Complaint

Amendment to Complaint (Order Required) filed by Abbey Pointe LLC. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Abbey Pointe LLC against Ryan Johnson filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Ryan Johnson served on 09/28/2016 by Post & Mail. $40.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Ryan Johnson Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service as to ALL OCCUPANTS filed by Abbey Pointe LLC. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Order

Order Allowing Service by Posting and Mailing Granted and filed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Declaration for Posting and Mailing

Declaration for Order for Posting and Mailing Summons and Complaint filed by Abbey Pointe LLC. Action Type: Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service of Summons and Complaint as to ALL OCCUPANTS by substituted service filed by Abbey Pointe LLC. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Abbey Pointe LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Abbey Pointe LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for Abbey Pointe LLC against Ryan Johnson in the amount of $1775.89. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Abbey Pointe LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by Abbey Pointe LLC. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Amendment to Complaint (Order Required) filed by Abbey Pointe LLC. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for Abbey Pointe LLC against Ryan Johnson filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service as to ALL OCCUPANTS filed by Abbey Pointe LLC. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Ryan Johnson served on 09/28/2016 by Post & Mail. $40.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Ryan Johnson Entered Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by Abbey Pointe LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration for Order for Posting and Mailing Summons and Complaint filed by Abbey Pointe LLC. Action Type: Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • Payment received by Abbey Pointe LLC in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 104491. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of service of Summons and Complaint as to ALL OCCUPANTS by substituted service filed by Abbey Pointe LLC. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • Attorney, Paul E Echols, retained for Abbey Pointe LLC . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Abbey Pointe LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Abbey Pointe LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • Payment received by Abbey Pointe LLC in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 101371. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Echols, Paul E