This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/02/2018 at 22:03:14 (UTC).

Aarons of Lodi vs. James William Bybee

Case Summary

On 06/16/2011 Aarons of Lodi filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against James William Bybee. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Lodi Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Urie, Phillip. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************8718

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Urie, Phillip

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aarons Of Lodi

Defendants

Bybee, Karry Lee

Bybee, James William

 

Court Documents

SC130 Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

09/12/2011: SC130 Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order

09/12/2011: Minute Order

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

09/12/2011: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order

07/25/2011: Minute Order

Proof of Service

07/18/2011: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

07/18/2011: Proof of Service

SC109 Authorization to Appear

06/16/2011: SC109 Authorization to Appear

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

06/16/2011: SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Payment Receipt

06/16/2011: Payment Receipt

SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

06/16/2011: SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2013
  • location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2011
  • location changed from Courthouse to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • Milestone of Disposition 75 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2011
  • Milestone of Disposition 95 days met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2011
  • Matter heard. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2011
  • Automatic Small Claims Disposition Clock stopped. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2011
  • Status of Karry Bybee updated to Dismissed without Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2011
  • Status of James Bybee updated to Dismissed without Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2011
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2011
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2011
  • Volume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 06/16/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • Case has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • Automatic Event Scheduled - Not Heard Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • Automatic Small Claims Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • Case initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • Court Trial (SC) - Pltfs claim 4036.48 cost 50.00auth to appear filed by Lakeba Franklin scheduled for 07/25/2011 at 08:15:00 AM in L2 at Lodi. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • Case assigned to Department L2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) filed by Aarons of Lodi on 06/16/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2011
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Aarons of Lodi on 06/16/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less