This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/23/2021 at 21:34:23 (UTC).

A & M Bogetti Bros., Inc. vs Dart Container Corporation of California et al.

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 A M Bogetti Bros , Inc filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Dart Container Corporation of California. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Waters, Robert T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************3458

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Waters, Robert T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A & M Bogetti Bros., Inc.

Defendants

Duenasorellana, Hector Mauricio

Dart Container Corporation of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stroup, Gregory M

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by A & M Bogetti Bros., Inc.. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Waters, Robert T..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by A & M Bogetti Bros., Inc.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Dart Container Corporation of California served on 06/14/2021 by Certified Mail. $0.00. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of service filed by A & M Bogetti Bros., Inc.. $0.00. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participant: A & M Bogetti Bros., Inc. (Plaintiff); Participant: Dart Container Corporation of California (Defendant); Participant: Hector Mauricio Duenasorellana (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of service filed by A & M Bogetti Bros., Inc.. $0.00. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Dart Container Corporation of California served on 06/14/2021 by Certified Mail. $0.00. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by A & M Bogetti Bros., Inc.. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by A & M Bogetti Bros., Inc.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Inc. A & M Bogetti Bros. in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 638962. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Gregory M Stroup, retained for A & M Bogetti Bros., Inc. . Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 10/18/2021 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dart Container Corporation of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stroup, Gregory M