Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/09/2018 at 23:21:48 (UTC).

A-L Financial Corp. vs. Michelle L Pavlatos Finley

Case Summary

On 12/16/2010 A-L Financial Corp filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Michelle L Pavlatos Finley. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Tracy Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************0648

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tracy Branch Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-L Financial Corp.

Defendant

Pavlatos Finley, Michelle L

Assignee

Pacific Credit Exchange, a Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Assignee Attorney

Blundo, Frank G. Jr.

 

Court Documents

Civil Bench Warrant

09/09/2015: Civil Bench Warrant

Return to Court Writ of Execution

05/29/2015: Return to Court Writ of Execution

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

05/11/2015: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process)

Bench Warrant Instruction Sheets

04/29/2015: Bench Warrant Instruction Sheets

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

04/14/2015: SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

11/17/2014: MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

SC134 Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination (Small Claims)

06/10/2011: SC134 Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination (Small Claims)

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

01/03/2011: SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/16/2010: SC100 Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

05/12/2015: Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

Payment Receipt

11/24/2014: Payment Receipt

SC109 Authorization to Appear

08/22/2011: SC109 Authorization to Appear

SC109 Authorization to Appear

07/25/2011: SC109 Authorization to Appear

SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

06/27/2011: SC104 Proof of Service (Small Claims)

SC130 Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

02/04/2011: SC130 Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

SC109 Authorization to Appear

02/04/2011: SC109 Authorization to Appear

SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

12/16/2010: SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

Payment Receipt

12/16/2010: Payment Receipt

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Appointment of Attorney Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Assignment of Judgment filed by Pacific Credit Exchange; A-L Financial Corp.. Action Type: Assignment of Judgment; Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Attorney, Frank G. Blundo Jr., retained for Pacific Credit Exchange . Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • Writ has been updated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2015
  • Writ of Execution Returned filed by A-L Financial Corp. on 06/01/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • location changed from Courtrooms,41,Other to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Small Claims to Courtrooms,41,Other Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • Bail ordered in the amount of 2,500.00 for Pavlatos Finley,Michelle on 04/27/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2010
  • Case has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • Volume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 12/16/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • Payment received for 06 - Claims greater than 12 within previous 12 months in the amount of 100.00 on 12/16/2010, transaction number 682086 and receipt number 175761. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • Automatic Event Scheduled - Not Heard Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • Case initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • Automatic Small Claims Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • Court Trial - Business (SC) - Principal, 2,500.00Costs, 100.00 scheduled for 02/04/2011 at 10:30:00 AM in T2 at Tracy. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • Case assigned to Department T2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2010
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by A-L Financial Corp. on 12/16/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC CREDIT EXCHANGE A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where A-L FINANCIAL CORP is a litigant