This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/08/2018 at 00:39:50 (UTC).

A L Financial Corp vs. Long

Case Summary

On 08/17/2010 A L Financial Corp filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Long. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Lodi Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Urie, Phillip. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************3901

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lodi Branch Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Urie, Phillip

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-L Financial Corp

Defendant

Long, Leong

Assignee

Pacific Credit Exchange

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

09/04/2013: Payment Receipt

Bench Warrant Instruction Sheets

04/20/2011: Bench Warrant Instruction Sheets

Bench Warrant Instruction Sheets

04/20/2011: Bench Warrant Instruction Sheets

Minute Order

04/19/2011: Minute Order

Minute Order

03/29/2011: Minute Order

Payment Receipt

02/07/2011: Payment Receipt

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

10/01/2010: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order

09/29/2010: Minute Order

SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

08/17/2010: SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

Payment Receipt

08/17/2010: Payment Receipt

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2014
  • Writ has been updated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • Writ of Execution Returned filed by A L Financial Corp on 10/27/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • Payment received for 141I - Writ in the amount of 25.00 on 09/04/2013, transaction number 1220107 and receipt number 323114. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • Writ issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • Costs acknowledged/updated. Judgment total updated to 3339.25. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • Postjudgment interest accrued 754.25. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Pacific Credit Exchange on 09/03/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • Address for Pacific Credit Exchange selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • Pacific Credit Exchange added as a Assignee effective 07/29/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • Proof of Service - MAILING (for Assignment of Judgment and Appointment of Attorney) filed by Pacific Credit Exchange on 07/26/2013. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2010
  • Volume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 08/17/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2010
  • Payment received for 06 - Claims greater than 12 within previous 12 months in the amount of 100.00 on 08/17/2010, transaction number and receipt number 144142. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2010
  • Address for Leong Long selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2010
  • Address for A-L Financial Corp selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2010
  • Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2010
  • Automatic Event Scheduled - Not Heard Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2010
  • Case title updated to A L Financial Corp vs. Long effective 08/17/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2010
  • Court Trial (SC) - plft clm 2500.00 pltf cost 100.00 scheduled for 09/29/2010 at 08:15:00 AM in L2 at Lodi. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2010
  • Case assigned to Department L2. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2010
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by A-L Financial Corp on 08/17/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less