This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/14/2018 at 14:20:41 (UTC).

A-L Financial Corp. vs. Jeffrey Kerley

Case Summary

On 08/20/2009 A-L Financial Corp filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jeffrey Kerley. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************5097

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-L Financial Corp.

Defendant

Kerley, Jeffrey

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

08/20/2009: Payment Receipt

SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

08/20/2009: SC100 Plaintiff Claim and Order to Defendant

Minute Order

09/30/2009: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/05/2009: Minute Order

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

10/08/2009: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Payment Receipt

02/08/2010: Payment Receipt

Minute Order

03/16/2010: Minute Order

Payment Receipt

08/01/2014: Payment Receipt

Memorandum

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $0.00 filed by A-L Financial Corp.. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Memorandum of Cost

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $0.00 filed by A-L Financial Corp.. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Writ Return

12/05/2016: Writ Return

Writ Return

Writ of Execution as to Jeffrey Kerley returned and filed. Status: Post & Mail. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Satisfaction of Judgment

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment filed by A-L Financial Corp.. Action Type: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment filed by A-L Financial Corp.. Action Type: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution as to Jeffrey Kerley returned and filed. Status: Post & Mail. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • DocketPayment received by A-L Financial Corp. in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 121176. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $0.00 filed by A-L Financial Corp.. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • DocketWrit of Execution issued as to Jeffrey Kerley on 11/14/2016 to Los Angeles County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketWrit of Execution issued as to Jeffrey Kerley on 05/20/2016 to Sacramento County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment $0.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $0.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $0.00 filed by A-L Financial Corp.. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • DocketPayment received by A-L Financial Corp. in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 67348. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Staff,Other to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2014
  • Docketlocation changed from Offsite,Records Management to Courthouse,Courthouse - Staff,Other Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2009
  • DocketCase has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • DocketVolume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 08/20/2009. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • DocketCase initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • DocketAutomatic Small Claims Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • DocketCase initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • DocketAutomatic Event Scheduled - Not Heard Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Small Claims Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • DocketCourt Trial (SC) - principal 2500.00 plus cost 100.00 scheduled for 09/30/2009 at 08:30:00 AM in B1 at Stockton. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • DocketCase assigned to Department B1. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2009
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by A-L Financial Corp. on 08/20/2009. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A-L FINANCIAL CORP is a litigant