This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 04/08/2020 at 10:29:19 (UTC).

125 Bridge Place Partners LLC vs Brenda Perez et al.

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 125 Bridge Place Partners LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against Brenda Perez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************2263

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

125 Bridge Place Partners LLC

Defendants

Perez, Brenda

Perez, Eriberto

Other

All Other Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rowe, Anthony Drew

 

Court Documents

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for 125 Bridge Place Partners LLC against Brenda Perez, Eriberto Perez filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Notice to Filing Party

Request for Default against Brenda Perez, Eriberto Perez Not Entered Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by 125 Bridge Place Partners LLC. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Order to Allow Service by Posting and Mailing

Order Allowing Service by Posting and Mailing Granted and filed. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Declaration in Support

Declaration of Anthony Drew Rowe/Benjamin D Rowe in Support Of Ex Parte Application for Posting and Mailing filed by 125 Bridge Place Partners LLC. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by 125 Bridge Place Partners LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

UnlawfulDetainerNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Brenda Perez, Eriberto Perez Entered Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Eriberto Perez served on 10/01/2019 by Post & Mail. $25.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Brenda Perez served on 10/01/2019 by Post & Mail. $25.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of as to All Other Occupants served on 10/01/2019. $25.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against All Other Occupants Entered Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Application for an Order to Service Summons by Posting and Mail

Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication filed by 125 Bridge Place Partners LLC. Action Type: Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by 125 Bridge Place Partners LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment for Money After Possession - UD entered and filed. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585 filed by 125 Bridge Place Partners LLC. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 585; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Court Judgment filed by 125 Bridge Place Partners LLC. Previously Entered. Action Type: Request for Entry of Court Judgment; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession issued as to Brenda Perez, Eriberto Perez on 10/28/2019 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketPayment received by 125 Bridge Place Partners LLC in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 491413. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Default Judgment for Possession for 125 Bridge Place Partners LLC against Brenda Perez, Eriberto Perez filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default against Brenda Perez, Eriberto Perez Entered Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by 125 Bridge Place Partners LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by 125 Bridge Place Partners LLC. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication filed by 125 Bridge Place Partners LLC. Action Type: Application/Request for Order Authorizing Service of Summons by Posting/Mailing or Publication; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketPayment received by 125 Bridge Place Partners LLC in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 477964. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by 125 Bridge Place Partners LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited Unlawful Detainer ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by 125 Bridge Place Partners LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Anthony Drew Rowe, retained for 125 Bridge Place Partners LLC . Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketPayment received by 125 Bridge Place Partners LLC in the amount of $385.00. Receipt number 474072. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.