This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/13/2016 at 05:46:03 (UTC).

ZURICH VERSICHERUNGS-GESELLSCHAFT AG VS. JAMAAL EUGENE WILLIAMS et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 ZURICH VERSICHERUNGS-GESELLSCHAFT AG filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against JAMAAL EUGENE WILLIAMS. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8430

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZURICH VERSICHERUNGS-GESELLSCHAFT AG A CORPORATION

Defendants

HARRISON, MALEKA NICOLE

WILLIAMS, JAMAAL EUGENE

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MAHONEY MICHAEL V

MAHONEY, MICHAEL VINCENT

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL V. MAHONEY

685 Market Street, Suite 370

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

Notice to Plaintiff

NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

Order Continuing Case Management Conference

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-05-2013 CONTINUED TO JUL-17-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZURICH VERSICHERUNGS-GESELLSCHAFT AG A CORPORATION

Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal (CRC 3.1385)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR OCT-29-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. THE AUG-27-2013 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Case Ordered Off Calendar

CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF OCT-29-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

Order To Show Cause

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR AUG-27-2013 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE JUL-17-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

COMPLAINT

SUBROGATION/INSURANCE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZURICH VERSICHERUNGS-GESELLSCHAFT AG A CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT WILLIAMS, JAMAAL EUGENE HARRISON, MALEKA NICOLE DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-05-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-02-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-21-2013 (Fee:370.00)

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF OCT-29-2013 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 SET FOR OCT-29-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. THE AUG-27-2013 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZURICH VERSICHERUNGS-GESELLSCHAFT AG A CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET FOR AUG-27-2013 IN DEPARTMENT 610 AT 10:30 AM FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT(S) AND OBTAIN ANSWER(S), OR ENTER DEFAULT(S). THE JUL-17-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE OF JUN-05-2013 CONTINUED TO JUL-17-2013 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 610. NOTICE SENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBROGATION/INSURANCE, COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ZURICH VERSICHERUNGS-GESELLSCHAFT AG A CORPORATION AS TO DEFENDANT WILLIAMS, JAMAAL EUGENE HARRISON, MALEKA NICOLE DOES 1 TO 10 SUMMONS ISSUED, JUDICIAL COUNCIL CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JUN-05-2013 PROOF OF SERVICE DUE ON APR-02-2013 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DUE ON MAY-21-2013 (Fee:370.00)

    Read MoreRead Less