This case was last updated from San Francisco County Superior Courts on 04/14/2016 at 08:38:45 (UTC).

ZHUO NUAN YUAN VS. KEVIN C YU

Case Summary

On 02/01/2013 ZHUO NUAN YUAN filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against KEVIN C YU. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts , Civic Center Courthouse located in San Francisco, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3063

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Francisco County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civic Center Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Francisco, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YUAN, ZHUO NUAN

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendant

YU, KEVIN C

Bakerfield, CA 93390

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF

DECLARATION OF ZUO NUAN YUAN RE: RESET FILED BY PLAINTIFF YUAN, ZHUO NUAN

RESET

TRIAL RESET TO DEC-30-2014 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 TRIAL OF OCT-30-2014 IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR (Fee:NO FEE)

Small Claims Order of Dismissal of Entire Action L.R. 18.0

THE COURT ORDERS DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. NO PROOF OF SERVICE. PLAINTIFF WAS NOT PRESENT. DEFENDANT WAS NOT PRESENT. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (D-506)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF

MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $10,000.00 FILED BY YUAN, ZHUO NUAN AS TO DEFENDANT YU, KEVIN C ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR APR-10-2013 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:75.00)

RESET

TRIAL RESET TO APR-29-2015 AT 03:30 PM IN DEPT 506 TRIAL OF MAR-02-2015 IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR (Fee:NO FEE)

DECLARATION

DECLARATION NON-SERVICE & REQUEST TO RESET COURT DATE FILED BY PLAINTIFF YUAN, ZHUO NUAN

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2015
  • SMALL CLAIMS ORDER OF DISMISSAL RETURNED. SENT TO:PLAINTIFF - YUAN, ZHUO NUAN. (ENVELOPE MARKED:RETURNED TO SENDER - ATTEMPTED - NOT KNOWN - UNABLE TO FORWARD; HANDWRITTEN NOTE: "VACANT")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • THE COURT ORDERS DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. NO PROOF OF SERVICE. PLAINTIFF WAS NOT PRESENT. DEFENDANT WAS NOT PRESENT. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: P. NATT. NOT REPORTED. (D-506)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • TRIAL RESET TO NOV-06-2015 AT 03:30 PM IN DEPT 506 TRIAL OF SEP-03-2015 IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF ZUO NUAN YUAN RE: RESET FILED BY PLAINTIFF YUAN, ZHUO NUAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • TRIAL RESET TO SEP-03-2015 AT 03:30 PM IN DEPT 506 TRIAL OF JUL-02-2015 IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • DECLARATION OF ZHUO NUAN YUAN RE: RESET FILED BY PLAINTIFF YUAN, ZHUO NUAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • TRIAL RESET TO JUL-02-2015 AT 03:30 PM IN DEPT 506 TRIAL OF APR-29-2015 IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE & REQUEST FOR RESET OF COURT DATE. FILED BY PLAINTIFF YUAN, ZHUO NUAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • TRIAL RESET TO APR-29-2015 AT 03:30 PM IN DEPT 506 TRIAL OF MAR-02-2015 IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2015
  • DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE & REQUEST FOR RESET OF COURT DATE. FILED BY PLAINTIFF YUAN, ZHUO NUAN

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2013
  • DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE. PLAINTIFF REQUESTS RESET FILED BY PLAINTIFF YUAN, ZHUO NUAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2013
  • TRIAL RESET TO DEC-20-2013 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 TRIAL OF OCT-18-2013 IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2013
  • DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE. PLAINTIFF REQUESTS RESET. FILED BY PLAINTIFF YUAN, ZHUO NUAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • TRIAL RESET TO OCT-18-2013 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 TRIAL OF AUG-19-2013 IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2013
  • DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE & REQUEST FOR RESET OF COURT DATE. FILED BY PLAINTIFF YUAN, ZHUO NUAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • TRIAL RESET TO AUG-19-2013 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 TRIAL OF JUN-13-2013 IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2013
  • DECLARATION OF NON-SERVICE & REQUEST FOR RESET OF COURT DATE. FILED BY PLAINTIFF YUAN, ZHUO NUAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2013
  • TRIAL RESET TO JUN-13-2013 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 TRIAL OF APR-10-2013 IS TAKEN OFF CALENDAR (Fee:NO FEE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2013
  • DECLARATION OF ZHUO NUAN YUNA FILED BY PLAINTIFF YUAN, ZHUO NUAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $10,000.00 FILED BY YUAN, ZHUO NUAN AS TO DEFENDANT YU, KEVIN C ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR APR-10-2013 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPT 506 (Fee:75.00)

    Read MoreRead Less